Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470125

EP3470125 - VIRTUAL OMNIMOVER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NBCUniversal Media, LLC
30 Rockefeller Plaza
New York, NY 10112 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KING, Steven, Morris
1000 Universal Studios Plaza
Orlando, FL 32819 / US
02 / LONG, Henry, William
8633 11th Avenue
Burnaby, British Columbia V3N 2P9 / CA
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Ahmad, Sheikh Shakeel , et al
Keltie LLP
No.1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BA / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18168855.712.06.2008
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS2007084761230.08.2007         Original published format: US 847612
[2019/16]
Previously filed application, dateWO2008US6672212.06.2008
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470125
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:A63G7/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VIRTUELLER OMNIMOVER[2019/16]
English:VIRTUAL OMNIMOVER[2019/16]
French:OMNIMOVER VIRTUEL[2019/16]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08770852.5  / EP2185259
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
17.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
17.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
17.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
17.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
17.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
17.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
17.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
17.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0024626  (INNOVATIVE TRANSPORTATION SYST [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 15, line 25 - line 30; figures 1-10 * * page 26, line 3 - line 30 *;
 [X]EP1671866  (CNH ITALIA SPA [IT]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US2006085107  (HOFFMANN OTTO [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-9; claims 1,20-22 *;
 [X]US2006255210  (FISCHER WERNER [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0083]; figures 1-26 * * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0100] *;
 [X]US5403238  (BAXTER ANTHONY W [US] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * column 24, line 49 - column 28, line 50; figures 1-22 *;
 [X]JPH07245814  (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006]; figures 1-8 *;
 [X]US5995895  (WATT JOHN D [US] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-10; claims 1-30 *