Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3401724

EP3401724 - METHOD, DEVICE, COMPUTER PROGRAM AND STORAGE MEDIUM FOR CONTROLLING GLASSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  12.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.05.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
10.05.2019Change - designated statespublished on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd.
Room 01, Floor 9
Rainbow City Shopping Mall II of
China Resources
No. 68, Qinghe Middle Street, Haidian District
Beijing 100085 / CN
[2018/46]
Inventor(s)01 / WU, Ke
c/o Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd.
Room 01, Floor 9, Rainbow City Shopping Mall II
of China Resources, No. 68, Qinghe Middle Street
Haidian District
Beijing, 100085 / CN
 [2018/46]
Representative(s)Kudlek, Franz Thomas
Dehns Germany
Theresienstraße 6-8
80333 München / DE
[2018/46]
Application number, filing date18168924.124.04.2018
[2018/46]
Priority number, dateCN20171033602212.05.2017         Original published format: CN201710336022
[2018/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3401724
Date:14.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2018
ClassificationInternational:G02C7/08
[2018/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/24]
Former [2018/46]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG, COMPUTERPROGRAMM UND SPEICHERMEDIUM ZUR STEUERUNG EINER BRILLE[2018/46]
English:METHOD, DEVICE, COMPUTER PROGRAM AND STORAGE MEDIUM FOR CONTROLLING GLASSES[2018/46]
French:PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS POUR COMMANDER DES VERRES[2018/46]
Examination procedure02.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/24]
02.05.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2015094191  (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * figures 3, 4 * * page 3, line 3 - page 7, line 4 * * page 9, line 19 - line 34 *;
 [I]EP3115831  (ESSILOR INT (COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'OPTIQUE) [FR]) [I] 1-11 * figure 2A * * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [ 0008] , [ 0015] - [0032] - [ 0049] - [0070] *;
 [I]EP2833196  (ESSILOR INTERNAT CIE GÉNÉRALE D OPTIQUE [FR]) [I] 1-11 * paragraphs [0009] - [0017] - [ 0031] - [0034] - [ 0050] - [0052] - [ 0055] , [ 0062] , [ 0073] * * paragraphs [0108] , [ 0109] *;
 [I]US2012127422  (TIAN YIBIN [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0010] , [ 0011] *;
 [A]DE102014208981  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0007] - [0010]; figures 1, 2 *