Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3406631

EP3406631 - GENETICALLY MODIFIED HUMAN NATURAL KILLER CELL LINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.05.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  26.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fox Chase Cancer Center
333 Cottman Avenue
Philadelphia, PA 19111-2497 / US
[2018/48]
Inventor(s)01 / CAMPBELL, Kerry S.
2 Hemlock Lane
Wyncote, PA 19095 / US
 [2018/48]
Representative(s)Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/48]Goodfellow, Hugh Robin
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date18169049.608.07.2005
[2018/48]
Priority number, dateUS20040586581P10.07.2004         Original published format: US 586581 P
[2018/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3406631
Date:28.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.2018
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/705, C12N5/00, C07K16/32, A61K39/395, A61K49/00, A61K35/17, C07K14/735, C07K16/28, C12N5/0783, G01N33/50, A61K35/12
[2018/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/26]
Former [2018/48]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:GENETISCH MODIFIZIERTE HUMANE NATÜRLICHE KILLERZELLENLINIEN[2018/48]
English:GENETICALLY MODIFIED HUMAN NATURAL KILLER CELL LINES[2018/48]
French:LIGNES DE CELLULES TUEUSES NATURELLES HUMAINES MODIFIÉES GÉNÉTIQUEMENT[2018/48]
Examination procedure16.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/26]
16.05.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05789289.5  / EP1771471
EP09164804.8  / EP2112162
EP14171739.7  / EP2801583
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
24.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
24.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
24.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
24.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
24.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
24.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
24.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
24.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
24.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
24.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
30.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
25.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[Y]  - DEAGLIO SILVIA ET AL, "Human CD38 and CD16 are functionally dependent and physically associated in natural killer cells", BLOOD, (20020401), vol. 99, no. 7, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 2490 - 2498, XP002376004 [Y] 1-9 * Materials and methods: Constructs Materials and methods: Transfection Results: Establishment of a CD16+ YT line and selection of CD16+ and CD16- sublines of NKL cells * * Results: CD38 becomes a receptor modulating cytotoxicity in YT CD16+ cells Fifth paragraph of the Discussion * * figure 6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood.V99.7.2490
 [Y]  - MANDELBOIM OFER ET AL, "Human CD16 as a lysis receptor mediating direct natural killer cell cytotoxicity", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19990511), vol. 96, no. 10, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5640 - 5644, XP002191492 [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.10.5640
 [Y]  - ZHANG JIAN ET AL, "Characterization of interleukin-15 gene-modified human natural killer cells: implications for adoptive cellular immunotherapy.", HAEMATOLOGICA. MAR 2004, (200403), vol. 89, no. 3, ISSN 1592-8721, pages 338 - 347, XP002376005 [Y] 5-9 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - H. B. FLEIT ET AL, "Human neutrophil Fc gamma receptor distribution and structure.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (19820501), vol. 79, no. 10, doi:10.1073/pnas.79.10.3275, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 3275 - 3279, XP055250106 [Y] 5-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.79.10.3275
 [A]  - ZHANG RAN ET AL, "Characterization of stem cell factor gene-modified human natural killer cell line, NK-92 cells: Implication in NK cell-based adoptive cellular immunotherapy", ONCOLOGY REPORTS, (200405), vol. 11, no. 5, ISSN 1021-335X, pages 1097 - 1106, XP002376006 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - GONG J-H ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION OF A HUMAN CELL LINE (NK-92) WITH PEHNOTYPICAL AND FUNCTIONAL CHARACTERISTICS OF ACTIVATED NATURAL KILLER CELLS", LEUKEMIA, MACMILLAN PRESS LTD, US, (199404), vol. 8, no. 4, ISSN 0887-6924, pages 652 - 658, XP002914219 [AD] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [A]  - ERNST LINDA K ET AL, "Allelic polymorphisms in the FcgammaRIIC gene can influence its function on normal human natural killer cells", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR MEDICINE (BERLIN), (200204), vol. 80, no. 4, ISSN 0946-2716, pages 248 - 257, XP002376007 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00109-001-0294-2
by applicantUS4676980
 US4816567
 WO9100360
 WO9220373
 WO9733551
 US5633425
 US5661016
 US5625126
 US3773919
 EP0758394
 US2002068044
 US5830725
    - ALTSCHUL, S.F.; T.L. MADDEN; A.A. SCHAFFER; J. ZHANG; Z. ZHANG; W. MILLER; D.J. LIPMAN, "Gapped BLAST and PSI-BLAST: a new generation of protein database search programs", Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/25.17.3389, pages 3389 - 402, XP002905950

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/25.17.3389
    - AUSTIN, C.P.; C.L. CEPKO, "Cellular migration patterns in the developing mouse cerebral cortex", Development, (19900000), vol. 110, pages 713 - 732
    - BODINE, D.M.; K.T. MCDONAGH; N.E. SEIDEL; A.W. NIENHUIS, "Survival and retrovirus infection of murine hematopoietic stem cells in vitro: effects of 5-FU and method of infection", Exp. Hematol, (19910000), vol. 19, pages 206 - 212
    - BOERNER, P.; R. LAFOND; W.Z. LU; P. BRAMS; I. ROYSTON, "Production of antigen-specific human monoclonal antibodies from in vitro-primed human splenocytes", J Immunol., (19910000), vol. 147, pages 86 - 95
    - BRENNAN, M.; P.F. DAVISON; H. PAULUS, "Preparation of bispecific antibodies by chemical recombination of monoclonal immunoglobulin G1 fragments", Science, (19850000), vol. 229, doi:doi:10.1126/science.3925553, pages 81 - 3, XP002028196

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.3925553
    - CAMPBELL, K.S.; S. YUSA; A. KIKUCHI-MAKI; T.L. CATINA, "NKp44 triggers NK cell activation through DAP12 association that is not influenced by a putative cytoplasmic inhibitory sequence", J Immunol., (20040000), vol. 172, doi:doi:10.4049/jimmunol.172.2.899, pages 899 - 906, XP055262102

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.172.2.899
    - CAPECCHI, M.R., "High efficiency transformation by direct microinjection of DNA into cultured mammalian cells", Cell, (19800000), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(80)90358-X, page 479, XP023910363

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(80)90358-X
    - CARTER, P., "Site-directed mutagenesis", BiochemJ., (19860000), vol. 237, pages 1 - 7
    - CEPKO, C.L.; B.E. ROBERTS; R.E. MULLIGAN, "Construction and applications of a highly transmissible murine retrovirus shuttle vector", Cell, (19840000), vol. 37, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(84)90440-9, pages 1053 - 1062, XP027462620

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(84)90440-9
    - CHANEY, W.G.; D.R. HOWARD; J.W. POLLARD; S. SALLUSTIO; P. STANLEY, "High-frequency transfection of CHO cells using Polybrene", Somatic Cell Mol. Genet., (19860000), vol. 12, page 237
    - CHEN, C.; H. OKAYAMA, "Calcium phosphate-mediated gene transfer: A highly efficient system for stably transforming cells with plasmid DNA", BioTechniques, (19880000), vol. 6, pages 632 - 638, XP002017855
    - CLARK, J.I.; R.K. ALPAUGH; M. VON MEHREN; J. SCHULTZ; J.R. GRALOW; M.A. CHEEVER; D.B. RING; L.M. WEINER, "Induction of multiple anti-c-erbB-2 specificities accompanies a classical idiotypic cascade following 2B 1 bispecific monoclonal antibody treatment", Cancer Immunol Immunother., (19970000), vol. 44, doi:doi:10.1007/s002620050382, pages 265 - 72, XP002560278

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002620050382
    - ELROY-STEIN, 0.; B. MOSS, "Cytoplasmic expression system based on constitutive synthesis of bacteriophage T7 RNA polymerase in mammalian cells", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA., (19900000), vol. 87, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.87.17.6743, pages 6743 - 6747, XP000563742

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.87.17.6743
    - ESCUDERO, J.; B. HOHN, "Transfer and integration of T-DNA without cell injury in the host plant", Plant Cell, (19970000), vol. 9, pages 2135 - 2142
    - FEKETE, D.M.; C.L. CEPKO, "Retroviral infection coupled with tissue transplantation limits gene transfer in the chick embryo", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA., (19930000), vol. 90, pages 2350 - 2354
    - FEIGNER, P.L.; T.R. GADEK; M. HOLM; R. ROMAN; H.W. CHAN; M. WENZ; J.P. NORTHROP; G.M. RINGOLD; M. DANIELSON, "Lipofectin: A highly efficient, lipid-mediated DNA/transfection procedure", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA., (19870000), vol. 84, pages 7413 - 7417
    - FIECK, A.; D.L. WYBORSKI; J.M. SHORT, "Modifications of the E.coli Lac repressor for expression in eukaryotic cells: effects of nuclear signal sequences on protein activity and nuclear accumulation", Nucleic Acids Res., (19920000), vol. 20, pages 1785 - 91, XP002095852
    - FISHWILD, D.M.; S.L. O'DONNELL; T. BENGOECHEA; D.V. HUDSON; F. HARDING; S.L. BERNHARD; D. JONES; R.M. KAY; K.M. HIGGINS; S.R. SCHR, "High-avidity human IgG kappa monoclonal . antibodies from a novel strain of minilocus transgenic mice [see comments", Nat Biotechnol., (19960000), vol. 14, pages 845 - 51
    - FLEIT, H.B.; S.D. WRIGHT; J.C. UNKELESS, "Human neutrophil Fc gamma receptor distribution and structure", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA., (19820000), vol. 79, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.79.10.3275, pages 3275 - 9, XP055250106

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.79.10.3275
    - FUJITA, T.; H. SHUBIYA; T. OHASHI; K. YAMANISHI; T. TANIGUCHI, "Regulation of human interleukin-2 gene: Functional DNA sequences in the 5' flanking region for the gene expression in activated T lymphocytes", Cell, (19860000), vol. 46, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(86)90660-4, pages 401 - 407, XP023883305

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(86)90660-4
    - GERSTMAYER, B.; B. GRONER; W. WELS; B.S. SCHNIERLE, "Stable expression of the ecotropic retrovirus receptor in amphotropic packaging cells facilitates the transfer of recombinant vectors and enhances the yield of retroviral particles", J Virol Methods, (19990000), vol. 81, pages 71 - 5
    - GONG, J.H.; G. MAKI; H.G. KLINGEMANN, "Characterization of a human cell line (NK-92) with phenotypical and functional characteristics of activated natural killer cells", Leukemia, (19940000), vol. 8, pages 652 - 8, XP002914219
    - GRAHAM, F.L.; A.J. VAN DER EB, "A new technique for the assay of infectivity of human adenovirus 5 DNA", Virology, (19730000), vol. 52, doi:doi:10.1016/0042-6822(73)90341-3, page 456, XP023052128

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6822(73)90341-3
    - GRUBER, M.; B.A. SCHODIN; E.R. WILSON; D.M. KRANZ, "Efficient tumor cell lysis mediated by a bispecific single chain antibody expressed in Escherichia coli", J Immunol., (19940000), vol. 152, pages 5368 - 74, XP000872832
    - HARLOW, E.; D. LANE, Antibodies: A laboratory manual, Cold Spring Harbor Laboratory Press, (19880000), page 726
    - HOOGENBOOM, H.R.; A.D. GRIFFITHS; K.S. JOHNSON; D.J. CHISWELL; P. HUDSON; G. WINTER, "Multi-subunit proteins on the surface of filamentous phage: methodologies for displaying antibody (Fab) heavy and light chains", Nucleic Acids Res., (19910000), vol. 19, pages 4133 - 7
    - HOUDEBINE, L.M., Transgenic animals: Generation and use, Harwood Academic Press, (19970000), page 576
    - HUANG, J.Y.; D.L. BRUTLAG, "The EMOTIF database", Nucleic Acids Res., (20010000), vol. 29, pages 202 - 4
    - ISHIURA, M.; S. HIROSE; T. UCHIDA; Y. HAMADA; Y. SUZUKI; Y. OKADA, "Phage particle-mediated gene transfer to cultured mammalian cells", Molecular and Cellular Biology, (19820000), vol. 2, pages 607 - 616, XP000572680
    - JONES, P.T.; P.H. DEAR; J. FOOTE; M.S. NEUBERGER; G. WINTER, "Replacing the complementarity-determining regions in a human antibody with those from a mouse", Nature, (19860000), vol. 321, doi:doi:10.1038/321522a0, pages 522 - 5, XP002949266

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/321522a0
    - KAUFMAN, R.J., "Vectors used for expression in mammalian cells", Methods Enzymol., (19900000), vol. 185, pages 487 - 511, XP009173401
    - KAWAI, S.; M. NISHIZAWA, "New procedure for DNA transfection with polycation and dimethyl sulfoxide", Mol. Cell. Biol., (19840000), vol. 4, page 1172, XP002107538
    - KIKUCHI-MAKI, A.; S. YUSA; T.L. CATINA; K.S. CAMPBELL, "KIR2DL4 is an IL-2-regulated NK cell receptor that exhibits limited expression in humans but triggers strong IFN-gamma production", J Imrnunol., (20030000), vol. 171, pages 3415 - 25
    - KINSELLA, T.M.; G.P. NOLAN, "Episomal vectors rapidly and stably produce high-titer recombinant retrovirus", Hum Gene Ther., (19960000), vol. 7, pages 1405 - 13, XP002928961
    - KOEHNE, G.; H.F. GUO; D. TRIVEDI; R.Y. WILLIAMS; R.J. O'REILLY; N.-K.V. CHEUNG, "Redirection NK-cell cytolytic activity to solid tumors using chemieric scFv receptor gene-modified adoptive immunotherapy", Proc. Am. Soc. Clin. Oncol., (20030000), vol. 22, page 175
    - KOENE, H.R.; M. KLEIJER; J. ALGRA; D. ROOS; A.E. VON DEM BORNE; M. DE HAAS, "Fc gammaRIIIa-158V/F polymorphism influences the binding of IgG by natural killer cell Fc gammaRIIIa, independently of the Fc gammaRIIIa-48L/R/H phenotype", Blood, (19970000), vol. 90, pages 1109 - 14
    - KOMATSU, F.; M. KAJIWARA, "Relation of natural killer cell line NK-92-mediated cytolysis (NK-92-lysis) with the surface markers of major histocompatibility complex class I antigens, adhesion molecules, and Fas of target cells", Oncol Res., (19980000), vol. 10, pages 483 - 9, XP003002677
    - KOSTELNY, S.A.; M.S. COLE; J.Y. TSO, "Formation of a bispecific antibody by the use of leucine zippers", J Immunol., (19920000), vol. 148, pages 1547 - 53
    - LAM, K.S., "Application of combinatorial library methods in cancer research and drug discovery", Anticancer Drug Design., (19970000), vol. 12, pages 145 - 167, XP000945295
    - LEMISCHKA, I.R.; D.H. RAULET; R.C. MULLIGAN, "Developmental potential and dynamic behavior of hematopoietic stem cells", Cell, (19860000), vol. 45, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(86)90566-0, pages 917 - 927, XP023883435

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(86)90566-0
    - LINDER, M.W.; R.A. PROUGH; R. VALDES, "Pharmacogenetics: a laboratory tool for optimizing therapeutic efficiency", Clin Chem., (19970000), vol. 43, pages 254 - 66, XP000877375
    - LONBERG, N.; D. HUSZAR, "Human antibodies from transgenic mice", Int Rev Immunol., (19950000), vol. 13, pages 65 - 93
    - LONBERG, N.; L.D. TAYLOR; F.A. HARDING; M. TROUNSTINE; K.M. HIGGINS; S.R. SCHRAMM; C.C. KUO; R. MASHAYEKH; K. WYMORE; J.G. MCCABE, "Antigen-specific human antibodies from mice comprising four distinct genetic modifications [see comments", Nature, (19940000), vol. 368, pages 856 - 9
    - LOPATA, M.A.; D.W. CLEVELAND; B. SOLLNER-WEBB, "High-level expression of a chloramphenicol acetyltransferase gene by DEAEdextran-mediated DNA traansfection couled with a dimethylsulfoxide or glycerol shock treatment", Nucleic Acids Research, (19840000), vol. 12, page 5707
    - MAKI, G.; H.G. KLINGEMANN; J.A. MARTINSON; Y.K. TARN, "Factors regulating the cytotoxic activity of the human natural killer cell line, NK-92", J Hematother Stem Cell Res., (20010000), vol. 10, pages 369 - 83
    - MARASCO, W.A.; W.A. HASELTINE; S.Y. CHEN, "Design, intracellular expression, and activity of a human anti-human immunodeficiency virus type 1 gpl20 single-chain antibody", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19930000), vol. 90, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.90.16.7889, pages 7889 - 93, XP000389696

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.90.16.7889
    - MARKS, J.D.; A.D. GRIFFITHS; M. MALMQVIST; T.P. CLACKSON; J.M. BYE; G. WINTER, "By-passing immunization: building high affinity human antibodies by chain shuffling", Biotechnology (N Y)., (19920000), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt0792-779, pages 779 - 83, XP002917376

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0792-779
    - MARKS, J.D.; H.R. HOOGENBOOM; T.P. BONNERT; J. MCCAFFERTY; A.D. GRIFFITHS; G. WINTER, "By-passing immunization. Human antibodies from V-gene libraries displayed on phage", JMol Biol., (19910000), vol. 222, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-2836(91)90498-U, pages 581 - 97, XP024010124

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(91)90498-U
    - MILLER, A.D.; C. BUTTIMORE, "Redesign of retrovirus packaging cell lines to avoid recombination leading to helper virus production", Mol. Cell biol., (19860000), vol. 6, pages 2895 - 2902
    - MILSTEIN, C.; A.C. CUELLO, "Hybrid hybridomas and their use in immunohistochemistry", Nature, (19830000), vol. 305, pages 537 - 40, XP001345424
    - NAGASHIMA, S.; R. MAILLIARD; Y. KASHII; T.E. REICHERT; R.B. HERBERMAN; P. ROBBINS; T.L. WHITESIDE, "Stable transduction of the interleukin-2 gene into human natural killer cell lines and their phenotypic and functional characterization in vitro and in vivo", Blood, (19980000), vol. 91, pages 3850 - 61, XP001153574
    - NEUMANN, E.; M. SCHAEFER-RIDDER; Y. WANG; P.H. HOFSCHNEIDER, "Gene transfer into mouse lyoma cells by electroporation in high electric fields", EMBO J., (19820000), vol. 1, pages 841 - 845, XP002038197
    - PEAR, W.; G. NOLAN; M. SCOTT; D. BALTIMORE, "Production of high-titer helper-free retroviruses by transient transfection", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA., (19930000), vol. 90, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.90.18.8392, pages 8392 - 8396, XP002286628

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.90.18.8392
    - PENDE, D.; S. PAROLINI; A. PESSINO; S. SIVORI; R. AUGUGLIARO; L. MORELLI; E. MARCENARO; L. ACCAME; A. MALASPINA; R. BIASSONI, "Identification and molecular characterization of NKp30, a novel triggering receptor involved in natural cytotoxicity mediated by human natural killer cells", J Exp Med., (19990000), vol. 190, doi:doi:10.1084/jem.190.10.1505, pages 1505 - 16, XP002167575

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.190.10.1505
    - PERUSSIA, B.; G. TRINCHIERI, "Antibody 3G8, specific for the human neutrophil Fc receptor, reacts with natural killer cells", J Immunol., (19840000), vol. 132, pages 1410 - 5
    - PESSINO, A.; S. SIVORI; C. BOTTINO; A. MALASPINA; L. MORELLI; L. MORETTA; R. BIASSONI; A. MORETTA, "Molecular cloning of NKp46: a novel member of the immunoglobulin superfamily involved in triggering of natural cytotoxicity", JExp Med., (19980000), vol. 188, doi:doi:10.1084/jem.188.5.953, pages 953 - 60, XP000953037

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.188.5.953
    - POTTER, H., "Electroporation in biology: Methods, applications,, and instrumentation", Analytical Biochemistry, (19880000), vol. 174, doi:doi:10.1016/0003-2697(88)90035-8, pages 361 - 373, XP024825568

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(88)90035-8
    - POTTER, H.; L. WEIR; P. LEDER, "Enhancer-dependent expression of human kappa immunoglobulin genes introduced into mouse pre-B lymphocytes by electroporation", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19840000), vol. 81, pages 7161 - 7165
    - PRESTA, L.G., "Antibody engineering", Curr Opin Biotechnol., (19920000), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/0958-1669(92)90168-I, pages 394 - 8, XP023601588

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0958-1669(92)90168-I
    - RASSOULZADEGAN, M.; B. BINETRUY; F. CUZIN, "High frequency of gene transfer after fusion between bacteria and eukaryotic cells", Nature, (19820000), vol. 295, page 257
    - REID, G.S.; S. BHARYA; H.G. KLINGEMANN; K.R. SCHULTZ, "Differential killing of pre-B acute lymphoblastic leukaemia cells by activated NK cells and the NK-92 ci cell line", Clin Exp Immunol., (20020000), vol. 129, pages 265 - 71
    - REISFELD, R.A.; S. SELL, Monoclonal antibodies and cancer therapy: Proceedings of the Roche-UCLA symposium held in Park City, Alan R. Liss, (19850126), page 609
    - RIECHMANN, L.; M. CLARK; H. WALDMANN; G. WINTER, "Reshaping human antibodies for therapy", Nature, (19880000), vol. 332, doi:doi:10.1038/332323a0, pages 323 - 7, XP002007067

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/332323a0
    - ROSE, J.K.; L. BUONOCORE; M. WHITT, "A new cationic liposome reagent mediating nearly quantitative transfection of animal cells", BioTechniques, (19910000), vol. 10, pages 520 - 525
    - SANDRI-GOLDIN, R.M.; A.L. GOLDIN; J.C. GLORIOSO; M. LEVINE, "High-frequency transfer of cloned herpes simjplex virus type I sequences to mammalian cells by protoplast fusion", Mol. Cell. Biol., (19810000), vol. 1, pages 7453 - 752
    - SCHAFFNER, W., "Direct transfer of cloned genes from bacteria to mammalian cells", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19800000), vol. 77, page 2163
    - SELDEN, R.F.; K. BURKE-HOWIE; M.E. ROWE; H.M. GOODMAN; D.D. MORRE, "Human growth hormone as a reporter gene in regulation studies employing transient gene expression", Molecular and Cellular Biololgy, (19860000), vol. 6, pages 3173 - 3179
    - SHALABY, M.R.; H.M. SHEPARD; L. PRESTA; M.L. RODRIGUES; P.C. BEVERLEY; M. FELDMANN; P. CARTER, "Development of humanized bispecific antibodies reactive with cytotoxic lymphocytes and tumor cells overexpressing the HER2 protooncogene", J Exp Med., (19920000), vol. 175, doi:doi:10.1084/jem.175.1.217, pages 217 - 25, XP002975222

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.175.1.217
    - SURESH, M.R.; A.C. CUELLO; C. MILSTEIN, "Bispecific monoclonal antibodies from hybrid hybridomas", Methods Enzymol., (19860000), vol. 121, pages 210 - 28, XP009176803
    - TAM, Y.K.; G. MAKI; B. MIYAGAWA; B. HENNEMANN; T. TONN; H.G. KLINGEMANN, "Characterization of genetically altered, interleukin 2-independent natural killer cell lines suitable for adoptive cellular immunotherapy", Hum Gene Ther., (19990000), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1089/10430349950018030, pages 1359 - 73, XP055233069

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/10430349950018030
    - TOURAEV, A., "Plant male germ line transformation", Plant J., (19970000), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1046/j.1365-313X.1997.12040949.x, pages 949 - 956, XP000198135

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-313X.1997.12040949.x
    - TRAUNECKER, A.; F. OLIVERI; K, KARJALAINEN, "Myeloma based expression system for production of large mammalian proteins", Trends Biotechnol., (19910000), vol. 9, doi:doi:10.1016/0167-7799(91)90038-J, pages 109 - 13, XP023571848

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-7799(91)90038-J
    - TRICK, H.N., "Recent advances in soybean transformation", Plant Tissue Cult. Biotechnol., (19970000), vol. 3, pages 9 - 26, XP055559607
    - TURNER, D.L.; E.Y. SNYDER; C.L. CEPKO, "Lineage-independent determinationh of cell type in the embryonic mouse retina", Neuron., (19900000), vol. 4, pages 833 - 845
    - TUTT, A.; G.T. STEVENSON; M.J. GLENNIE, "Trispecific F(ab')3 derivatives that use cooperative signaling via the TCR/CD3 complex and CD2 to activate and redirect resting cytotoxic T cells", J Immunol., (19910000), vol. 147, pages 60 - 9, XP000863699
    - UHEREK, C.; B. GRONER; W. WELS, "Chimeric antigen receptors for the retargeting of cytotoxic effector cells", J Hematother Stem Cell Res., (20010000), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1089/15258160152509136, pages 523 - 34, XP008038462

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/15258160152509136
    - UHEREK, C.; T. TONN; B. UHEREK; S. BECKER; B. SCHNIERLE; H.G. KLINGEMANN; W. WELS, "Retargeting of natural killer-cell cytolytic activity to ErbB2-expressing cancer cells results in efficient and selective tumor cell destruction", Blood, (20020000), vol. 100, pages 1265 - 73
    - VERHOEYEN, M.; C. MILSTEIN; G. WINTER, "Reshaping human antibodies: grafting an antilysozyme activity", Science, (19880000), vol. 239, doi:doi:10.1126/science.2451287, pages 1534 - 6, XP002949269

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.2451287
    - VITALE, M.; C. BOTTINO; S. SIVORI; L. SANSEVERINO; R. CASTRICONI; E. MARCENARO; R. AUGUGLIARO; L. MORETTA; A. MORETTA, "NKp44, a novel triggering surface molecule specifically expressed by activated natural killer cells, is involved in non-major histocompatibility complex-restricted tumor cell lysis", J Exp Med., (19980000), vol. 187, doi:doi:10.1084/jem.187.12.2065, pages 2065 - 72, XP002247249

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.187.12.2065
    - WEINER, L.M.; J.I. CLARK; M. DAVEY; W.S. LI; I. GARCIA DE PALAZZO; D.B. RING; R.K. ALPAUGH, "Phase I trial of 2B 1, a bispecific monoclonal antibody targeting c-erbB-2 and Fc gamma RIII", Cancer Res., (19950000), vol. 55, pages 4586 - 93
    - WEINER, L.M.; J.I. CLARK; D.B. RING; R.K. ALPAUGH, "Clinical development of2Bl, a bispecific murine monoclonal antibody targeting c-erbB-2 and Fc gamma RIII", J Hematother., (19950000), vol. 4, pages 453 - 6
    - WEINER, L.M.; M, HOLMES; A. RICHESON; A. GODWIN; G.P. ADAMS; S.T. HSIEH-MA; D.B. RING; R.K. ALPAUGH, "Binding and cytotoxicity characteristics of the bispecific murine monoclonal antibody 2B1", J I nrrZUnol., (19930000), vol. 151, pages 2877 - 86
    - WELLS, J.A.; M. VASSER; D.B. POWERS, "Cassette mutagenesis: an efficient method for generation of multiple mutations at defined sites", Gene, (19850000), vol. 34, doi:doi:10.1016/0378-1119(85)90140-4, pages 315 - 23, XP023539300

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(85)90140-4
    - WHITT, M.A.; L. BUONOCORE; J.K. ROSE; V. CICCARONE; G. GEBEYEHU, "TransfectACE reagent promotes transient transfection frequencies greater than 90%", Focus, (19900000), vol. 13, pages 8 - 12
    - WIGLER, M.; A. PELLICER; S. SILVERSTTEIN; R. AXEL, "Biochemical transfer of single-copy eucaryotic genes using total cellular DNA as donor", Cell, (19780000), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(78)90254-4, page 725, XP027461899

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(78)90254-4
    - WILMUT, I; A.E. SCHNIEKE; J. MCWHIR; A.J. KIND; K.H. CAMPBELL, "Viable offspring derived from fetal and adult mammalian cells", Nature, (19970000), vol. 385, doi:doi:10.1038/385810a0, pages 810 - 3, XP002067035

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/385810a0
    - WONG, T.K.; E. NEUMANN, "Electric field mediated gene transfer", Biochemical and Biophysical Research Communications, (19820000), vol. 107, doi:doi:10.1016/0006-291X(82)91531-5, pages 584 - 587, XP024846537

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(82)91531-5
    - WYBORSKI, D.L.; L.C. DUCOEUR; J.M. SHORT, "Parameters affecting the use of the lac repressor system in eukaryotic cells and transgenic animals", Environ Mol Mutagen., (19960000), vol. 28, pages 447 - 58
    - WYBORSKI, D.L.; J.M. SHORT, "Analysis of inducers of the E.coli lac repressor system in mammalian cells and whole animals", Nucleic Acids Res., (19910000), vol. 19, pages 4647 - 53
    - YAN, Y.; P. STEINHERZ; H.G. KLINGEMANN; D. DENNIG; B.H. CHILDS; J. MCGUIRK; R.J. O'REILLY, "Antileukemia activity of a natural killer cell line against human leukemias", Clin Cancer Res., (19980000), vol. 4, pages 2859 - 68
    - YUSA, S.; K.S. CAMPBELL, "Src homology region 2-containing protein tyrosine phosphatase-2 (SHP-2) can play a direct role in the inhibitory function of killer cell Ig-like receptors in human NK cells", J Immunol., (20030000), vol. 170, pages 4539 - 47
    - YUSA, S.; T.L. CATINA; K.S. CAMPBELL, "SHP-1- and phosphotyrosine-independent inhibitory signaling by a killer cell Ig-like receptor cytoplasmic domain in human NK cells", J Immunol., (20020000), vol. 168, pages 5047 - 57
    - YUSA, S.; T.L. CATINA; K.S. CAMPBELL, "KIR2DL5 can inhibit human NK cell activation via recruitment of Src homology region 2-containing protein tyrosine phosphatase-2 (SHP-2", J Immunol., (20040000), vol. 172, pages 7385 - 92
    - ZOLLER, M.J.; M. SMITH, "Oligonucleotide-directed mutagenesis: a simple method using two oligonucleotide primers and a single-stranded DNA template", Methods Enzymol., (19870000), vol. 154, doi:doi:10.1016/0076-6879(87)54083-6, pages 329 - 50, XP000615890

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0076-6879(87)54083-6