Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3376616

EP3376616 - INTERBAND CASCADE LASERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.05.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Government of the United States of America as represented by the Secretary of the Navy
Naval Research Laboratory. 4555 Overlook Avenue, S.W., Code 1008.2
Washington, DC 20375 / US
[2018/38]
Inventor(s)01 / VURGAFTMAN, Igor
2376 Sandy Walk Way
Odenton, MD Maryland 21113 / US
02 / MEYER, Jerry, R.
121 Oak Drive
Catonsville, MD Maryland 21228 / US
03 / CANEDY, Chadwick, L.
910 M St Nw 902
Washington, DC District of Columbia 20001 / US
04 / BEWLEY, William, W.
3509 Gordon Street
Falls Church, VA Virginia 22041 / US
05 / LINDLE, James, R.
2712 Birdseye Lane
Bowie, MD Maryland 20715 / US
06 / KIM, Chul-soo
6400 Wainfleet Ct.
Springfield, VA Virginia 22152 / US
07 / KIM, Mijin
6400 Wainfleet Ct.
Springfield, VA Virginia 22152 / US
 [2018/38]
Representative(s)Raynor, Simon Mark
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Altius House
1 North Fourth Street
Milton Keynes MK9 1DG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/38]Raynor, Simon Mark
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Altius House
1 North Fourth Street
Milton Keynes MK9 1NE / GB
Application number, filing date18169359.921.11.2011
[2018/38]
Priority number, dateUS20100415898P22.11.2010         Original published format: US 415898 P
US20111302365609.02.2011         Original published format: US201113023656
[2018/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3376616
Date:19.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2018
ClassificationInternational:H01S5/34, B82Y20/00, // H01S5/343
[2018/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Former [2018/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:INTERBANDKASKADENLASER[2018/38]
English:INTERBAND CASCADE LASERS[2018/38]
French:LASERS À CASCADE INTERBANDE[2018/38]
Examination procedure15.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
15.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11843179.0  / EP2643908
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
25.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
25.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
25.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
25.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
27.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XDI]US2010097690  (VURGAFTMAN IGOR [US], et al) [XD] 1,4,5,8,9 * paragraphs [0010] - [0013] - [0022] - [0052]; figures 1, 2a; claim 72 * [I] 3;
 [AD]US5793787  (MEYER JERRY R [US], et al) [AD] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5936989  (CAPASSO FEDERICO [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [XP]  - VURGAFTMAN I ET AL, "Mid-IR Type-II Interband Cascade Lasers", IEEE JOURNAL OF SELECTED TOPICS IN QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20110901), vol. 17, no. 5, doi:10.1109/JSTQE.2011.2114331, ISSN 1077-260X, pages 1435 - 1444, XP011388511 [XP] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSTQE.2011.2114331
by applicantUS5588015
 US5457709
 US5799026
 US5793787
 US2010097690
    - T. HOSODA et al., "Diode lasers emitting near 3.44 m in continuous-wave regime at 300K", Electron. Lett., (20100000), vol. 46, doi:doi:10.1049/EL:20102564, page 1455, XP006037026

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/EL:20102564
    - Q. Y. LU et al., "Room-temperature continuous wave operation of distributed feedback quantum cascade lasers with watt-level power output", Appl. Phys. Lett., (20100000), vol. 97, doi:doi:10.1063/1.3525859, page 231119, XP012138003

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.3525859
    - SLIVKEN et al., "Powerful QCLs eye remote sensing", Compound Semiconductor, pages 22 - 23
    - R. Q. YANG et al., "High-power interband cascade lasers with quantum efficiency > 450%", Electron. Lett., (19990000), vol. 35, doi:doi:10.1049/el:19990880, page 1254, XP006012457

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19990880
    - R. Q. YANG et al., "Mid-Infrared Type-II Interband Cascade Lasers", IEEE J. Quant. Electron., (20020000), vol. 38, doi:doi:10.1109/JQE.2002.1005406, page 559, XP001116480

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JQE.2002.1005406
    - K. MANSOUR et al., "Mid-infrared interband cascade lasers at thermoelectric cooler temperatures", Electron. Lett., (20060000), vol. 42, doi:doi:10.1049/el:20062442, page 1034, XP006027236

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:20062442
    - R. MAULINI et al., "Widely tunable high-power external cavity quantum cascade laser operating in continuous-wave at room temperature", Electronics Letters, (20090000), vol. 45, doi:doi:10.1049/EL:20093057, page 107, XP006032470

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/EL:20093057
    - D. CAFFEY et al., "Performance Characteristics of a Continuous Wave Compact Widely Tunable External Cavity Interband Cascade Laser", Opt. Express, (20100000), vol. 18, page 15691
    - C. L. CANEDY et al., "High-Power, Narrow-Ridge, Mid-Infrared Interband Cascade Lasers", J. Cryst. Growth, (20070000), vol. 301, page 931
    - CANEDY et al., "High-Power and High-Efficiency Midwave-Infrared Interband Cascade Lasers", Appl. Phys. Lett., (20060000), vol. 88, doi:doi:10.1063/1.2195778, page 161103, XP012081145

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.2195778