Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470280

EP3470280 - ELECTRIC TRAVELLING VEHICLE AND GRASS MOWER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 17.04.2019  [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kubota Corporation
2-47, Shikitsuhigashi 1-chome
Naniwa-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 556-8601 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / MATSUDA, Kazuaki
c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION
Sakai Seizosho
64, Ishizukitamachi
Sakai-ku
Sakai-shi, Osaka 5900823 / JP
02 / ITO, Hirokazu
c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION
Sakai Seizosho
64, Ishizukitamachi
Sakai-ku
Sakai-shi, Osaka 5900823 / JP
03 / MANJI, Yasuhiro
c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION
Sakai Seizosho
64, Ishizukitamachi
Sakai-ku
Sakai-shi, Osaka 5900823 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18175560.401.06.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateJP2017020028216.10.2017         Original published format: JP 2017200282
JP2017020718926.10.2017         Original published format: JP 2017207189
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470280
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:B60T8/17, B60T17/18, F16D67/06, B60T13/74, B60L7/26, B60L15/20, A01D34/00, A01D34/412, A01D34/82, A01D34/64, A01D34/78
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHES BEWEGBARES FAHRZEUG UND RASENMÄHER[2019/16]
English:ELECTRIC TRAVELLING VEHICLE AND GRASS MOWER[2019/16]
French:VÉHICULE ROULANT ÉLECTRIQUE ET TONDEUSE[2019/16]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
01.06.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Documents cited:Search[I]EP2664488  (HYDRO GEAR LTD PARTNERSHIP [US]) [I] 1-5 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0003] , [ 0005] , [ 0022] , [ 0033] - [0039] - [ 0056] - [0059]; figures 2, 4, 5, 7, 10 *;
 [I]JP2002354603  (ATEX CO LTD) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0004] - [0010] - [ 0013]; figure 2 *;
 [XA]US2017079210  (YOSHIMATSU ATSUHIRO [JP]) [X] 6,7 * paragraphs [0021] - [0038]; figures 1-3 * [A] 8-10;
 [A]US2012227368  (KOIKE KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 6-10 * paragraphs [0036] - [0061]; figures 2-8 *;
 [A]US2016295797  (ITO HIROKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 6-10 * paragraphs [0017] - [0019] - [0 51] - [0059]; figures 1,3, 4 *
by applicantJPH10164705
 JP2012187026
 JP2017104142