blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3392788

EP3392788 - HANDLING DATA REQUESTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.04.2024
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.04.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2024New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) 
05.07.2024New entry: Payment of fee for grant 
05.07.2024New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amadeus S.A.S.
485 route du Pin Montard
Sophia Antipolis
06410 Biot / FR
[2018/43]
Inventor(s)01 / LEGRAND, Guillaume
21 rue du Docteur Calmette
06110 Le Cannet / FR
 [2018/52]
Former [2018/43]01 / LEGRAND, Guillaume
68 Beal Road
Waltham, MA Massachusetts 2453 / US
Representative(s)Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
[2018/43]
Application number, filing date18175669.303.08.2015
[2018/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3392788
Date:24.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.07.2018
ClassificationIPC:G06F16/2455
[2024/16]
CPC:
G06F16/24552 (EP)
Former IPC [2018/43]G06F17/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/22]
Former [2018/43]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:HANDHABUNG VON DATENANFRAGEN[2018/43]
English:HANDLING DATA REQUESTS[2018/43]
French:GESTIONS DE DEMANDES DE DONNÉES[2018/43]
Examination procedure17.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/22]
17.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.03.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2021Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.02.2021
27.01.2021Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
25.02.2021Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
20.07.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.11.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2024Fee for grant paid
04.07.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.07.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Appeal following examination06.04.2021Appeal received No.  T0729/21
06.04.2021Payment of appeal fee
04.06.2021Statement of grounds filed
02.05.2023Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
14.07.2023Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal
02.05.2023Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15290199.7  / EP3128441
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
04.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
02.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
20.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 06
24.08.2021Renewal fee patent year 07
25.08.2022Renewal fee patent year 08
25.08.2023Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[ID]WO9922315  (CACHEFLOW INC [US]) [ID] 1,2,11-14 * page 3, line 14 - line 26 * * page 6, line 11 - page 8, line 26 *;
 [IA]US2009228446  (ANZAI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-8,11-14 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] * [A] 9,10;
 [I]  - JUNGHOO CHO ET AL, "Synchronizing a database to improve freshness", vol. 29, no. 2, ISBN 978-1-58113-218-2, (20000516), pages 117 - 128, PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2000 ACM SIGMOD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MANAGEMENT OF DATA, MAY 16-18, 2000, DALLAS, TEXAS, USA; [ISSAC. PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SYMBOLIC AND ALGEBRAIC COM, URL: http://dblp.uni-trier.de, XP002449369 [I] 1,2,11-14 * page 118, paragraph 2 - page 121, paragraph 3 *
 [A]  - Deborah Steiner ET AL, "Oracle Web Cache. Administration Deployment Guide Release, 1.0.2.3", (20010302), pages 1 - 198, URL: https://docs.oracle.com/cd/A97336_01/cache.102/a86722.pdf, (20160201), XP055246645 [A] 1-14 * pages 2-2 - pages 2-4 *
by applicantWO9922315
 WO0133472
 WO0225557
 US2009204753
 EP2541473
 WO2014026753
 WO2013EP02390
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.