Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3392788 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3392788



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 459
04.07.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.07.2024 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.07.2024 French translation of claims Search / examination 8
04.07.2024 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
04.07.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.04.2024 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
09.04.2024 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
09.04.2024 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
09.04.2024 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
09.04.2024 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 41
09.04.2024 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 41
30.11.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.11.2023 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
30.11.2023 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
30.11.2023 Claims Search / examination 5
30.11.2023 Description Search / examination 6
30.11.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.11.2023 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.07.2023 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
20.07.2023 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.07.2023 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 22
14.07.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
09.05.2023 Claims submitted during oral proceedings Appeal 5
09.05.2023 Claims submitted during oral proceedings Appeal 5
09.05.2023 Claims submitted during oral proceedings Appeal 5
09.05.2023 Claims submitted during oral proceedings Appeal 5
09.05.2023 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
09.05.2023 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 3
21.04.2023 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
03.04.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.04.2023 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
03.04.2023 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
03.04.2023 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
03.04.2023 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
03.04.2023 Claims Appeal 5
03.04.2023 Claims Appeal 5
03.04.2023 Claims Appeal 5
03.04.2023 Claims Appeal 5
03.04.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.04.2023 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
30.12.2022 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.12.2022 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 44
09.12.2022 F3011.2 Oral Proceedings: Summons VICO Appeal 5
09.12.2022 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 10
06.12.2022 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
03.05.2022 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
10.06.2021 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
04.06.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
04.06.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.06.2021 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
06.04.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.04.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
06.04.2021 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
01.02.2021 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
27.01.2021 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
27.01.2021 Decision to refuse according to the state of the file Search / examination 2
27.01.2021 Means of redress Search / examination 2
26.01.2021 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
22.01.2021 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
18.01.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.01.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.01.2021 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
04.09.2020 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
08.07.2020 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.07.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
02.07.2020 Annex to the communication Search / examination 9
02.07.2020 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
11.03.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.03.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.03.2020 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
03.01.2020 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
18.12.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.12.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.12.2019 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.09.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
04.09.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.08.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
13.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
06.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.06.2019 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
17.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.04.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
17.04.2019 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 6
15.02.2019 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
07.02.2019 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
27.11.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.11.2018 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
29.10.2018 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.09.2018 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
21.09.2018 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
14.09.2018 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
12.09.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
27.07.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.07.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
06.07.2018 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.07.2018 European search opinion Search / examination 7
06.07.2018 European search report Search / examination 3
06.07.2018 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
25.06.2018 Search started Search / examination 1
04.06.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.06.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
04.06.2018 Claims Search / examination 5
04.06.2018 Description Search / examination 25
04.06.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.06.2018 Drawings Search / examination 11
04.06.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5