EP3388890 - Backlight assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/42] | BACKLIGHT ASSEMBLY | ||
[2020/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cho, Joo-Woan 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Shim, Sung-Kyu 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Joo-Young 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Park, Jin-Hee 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Lee, Sang-Hoon 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Shin, Taek-Sun 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 07 /
Choi, Kwang-Wook 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2018/42] | Application number, filing date | 18175670.1 | 16.06.2010 | [2018/42] | Priority number, date | KR20090116409 | 30.11.2009 Original published format: KR 20090116409 | [2018/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3388890 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3388890 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13357, G02B6/00 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
G02B6/0068 (EP,US);
G02F1/1333 (KR);
G02B6/0038 (US);
F21K9/61 (EP,US);
G02B6/0073 (EP,US);
G02B6/0083 (US);
G02B6/0085 (EP,US);
G02B6/0088 (EP,US);
G02B6/0091 (US);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
G02F1/1336 (US);
G02F1/133615 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
G02F2201/46 (EP,US);
G02F2201/54 (EP,US);
G02F2203/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] |
Former [2018/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Rückbeleuchtungsanordnung | [2020/08] | English: | Backlight assembly | [2020/09] | French: | Ensemble de rétroéclairage | [2020/08] |
Former [2018/42] | HINTERGRUNDBELEUCHTUNGSANORDNUNG | ||
Former [2018/42] | BACKLIGHT ASSEMBLY | ||
Former [2018/42] | ENSEMBLE DE RÉTROÉCLAIRAGE | Examination procedure | 09.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 09.04.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10006226.4 / EP2362263 | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.06.2010 | AL | 13.05.2020 | AT | 13.05.2020 | CY | 13.05.2020 | CZ | 13.05.2020 | DK | 13.05.2020 | EE | 13.05.2020 | ES | 13.05.2020 | FI | 13.05.2020 | HR | 13.05.2020 | IT | 13.05.2020 | LT | 13.05.2020 | LV | 13.05.2020 | MC | 13.05.2020 | MK | 13.05.2020 | MT | 13.05.2020 | PL | 13.05.2020 | RO | 13.05.2020 | SE | 13.05.2020 | SI | 13.05.2020 | SK | 13.05.2020 | SM | 13.05.2020 | TR | 13.05.2020 | IE | 16.06.2020 | LU | 16.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | BG | 13.08.2020 | NO | 13.08.2020 | GR | 14.08.2020 | IS | 13.09.2020 | PT | 14.09.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 16.06.2010 | |
AL | 13.05.2020 | ||
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
MT | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
TR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 16.06.2020 | ||
LU | 16.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 16.06.2020 | ||
LU | 16.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 16.06.2020 | ||
LU | 16.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 16.06.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
AT | 13.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 13.05.2020 | |
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 13.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6046785 (WON SE CHANG [KR]) [A] 1-10 * figures 3A, 3B, 4 * * and the associated text passages *; | [A]JP2004184493 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [A]US2006012731 (ISHIWA MASARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 4 * * and the associated text passages * |