blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3579458

EP3579458 - SYSTEM FOR SYNCHRONIZING A GROUND SEGMENT TO A BEAM HOPPING SATELLITE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.08.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.08.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.04.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.03.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ST Engineering iDirect (Europe) Cy NV
Laarstraat 5
9100 Sint-Niklaas / BE
[2020/30]
Former [2019/50]For all designated states
NEWTEC CY
Laarstraat 5
9100 Sint-Niklaas / BE
Inventor(s)01 / BREYNAERT, Dirk
Jef de Pauwstraat 23
9100 Sint-Niklaas / BE
02 / CHRISTOPOULOS, Dimitrios
Lange Nieuwstraat 58, bus A
2000 Antwerpen / BE
 [2019/50]
Representative(s)Winger
Hundelgemsesteenweg 1116
9820 Merelbeke / BE
[N/P]
Former [2019/50]DenK iP
Hundelgemsesteenweg 1116
9820 Merelbeke / BE
Application number, filing date18176340.006.06.2018
[2019/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3579458
Date:11.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3579458
Date:30.09.2020
Language:EN
[2020/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.11.2018
ClassificationIPC:H04B7/204
[2019/50]
CPC:
H04B7/2041 (EP,IL,US); H04B1/69 (IL,US); H04B7/18513 (EP,IL,US);
H04B7/212 (IL,US); H04B2001/6908 (IL,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/17]
Former [2019/50]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUM SYNCHRONISIEREN EINES BODENSEGMENTS MIT EINEM STRAHLSPRUNGSATELLITEN[2019/50]
English:SYSTEM FOR SYNCHRONIZING A GROUND SEGMENT TO A BEAM HOPPING SATELLITE[2019/50]
French:SYSTÈME POUR SYNCHRONISER UN SEGMENT TERRESTRE À UN SATELLITE DE SAUT DE FAISCEAU[2019/50]
Examination procedure17.03.2020Examination requested  [2020/17]
17.03.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.04.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2020Fee for grant paid
18.07.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.07.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP20181831.7  / EP3761524
Opposition(s)01.07.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.06.2018
AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CY30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
MK30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
IE06.06.2021
LU06.06.2021
CH30.06.2021
LI30.06.2021
[2024/23]
Former [2023/33]HU06.06.2018
AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CY30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
IE06.06.2021
LU06.06.2021
CH30.06.2021
LI30.06.2021
Former [2023/30]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CY30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
IE06.06.2021
LU06.06.2021
CH30.06.2021
LI30.06.2021
Former [2022/23]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
IE06.06.2021
LU06.06.2021
CH30.06.2021
LI30.06.2021
Former [2022/21]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
IE06.06.2021
LU06.06.2021
CH30.06.2021
LI30.06.2021
Former [2022/18]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
LU06.06.2021
Former [2022/10]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2022/08]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/50]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/48]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/37]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/30]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/28]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/25]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/23]AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/22]CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/21]FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/20]FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
Former [2021/10]FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
Former [2021/08]FI30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
Former [2021/07]FI30.09.2020
NO30.12.2020
Documents cited:Search[A]US2017289822  (HREHA WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0112] * * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0123] * * paragraph [0166] - paragraph [0172] ** figures 50-53 *
by applicantUS4763129
 US6104729
 US6215442
 US6295023
 US2001039192
 US6452541
 US6992992
 US7660377
 EP2549663
 US2016204854
 WO2016160282
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.