Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470084

EP3470084 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF DELIVERY OF PHARMACOLOGICAL AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2019Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 17.04.2019  [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Abraxis BioScience, LLC
86 Morris Avenue
Summit, NJ 07901 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DESAI, Neil P.
1343 Luna Vista Drive
Pacific Palisades, CA California 90272 / US
02 / YANG, Andrew
4309 Rio Hondo Avenue
Rosemead, CA California 92770 / US
03 / CI, Sherry Xiaopei
1987 San Salvatore Place
San Marino, CA California 91108 / US
04 / DE, Tapas
10927 Palms Boulevard Apt. 2
Los Angeles, CA California 90034 / US
05 / TRIEU, Vuong
4003 Jim Bowie
Agoura Hills, CA California 91301 / US
06 / SOON-SHIONG, Patrick
9922 Jefferson Boulevard
Culver City, CA California 90232 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Jones Day
Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte
Prinzregentenstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18178236.809.12.2003
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS20020432317P09.12.2002         Original published format: US 432317 P
US20030526544P03.12.2003         Original published format: US 526544 P
US20030526773P04.12.2003         Original published format: US 526773 P
US20030527177P05.12.2003         Original published format: US 527177 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470084
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61K47/18, A61K47/42, A61K9/51, B82Y5/00, A61K31/436, A61K31/05, A61K31/16, A61K31/164, A61K31/165, A61K31/198, A61K31/24, A61K31/337, A61K31/343, A61K31/355, A61K31/427, A61K31/4745, A61K31/7048, A61K38/13, A61K9/107, A61K9/19, A61K9/14
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND ALBUMINNANOPARTIKEL UND METHODEN ZUR FREISETZUNG VON WIRKSTOFFEN[2019/16]
English:COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF DELIVERY OF PHARMACOLOGICAL AGENTS[2019/16]
French:COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DES NANOPARTICULES D'ALBUMINE ET MÉTHODES POUR LA LIBÉRATION DE PRINCIPES ACTIFS[2019/16]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03799876.2  / EP1585548
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
18.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
18.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
18.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
18.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
18.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
18.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
18.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
18.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
18.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
18.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
18.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
18.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 15
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 16
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0035765  (NIHON MEDIPHYSICS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * examples 12, 13, 15 * * claim 4 *;
 [X]EP0304183  (BIOMED FRONTIERS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * example 6 * * claim 7 *;
 [X]WO9207259  (BIOMED FRONTIERS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * claim 13 * * page 23, line 10 *;
 [A]WO9900113  (VIVORX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]; DESAI NEIL P [US]; SOON SHIONG PATRIC) [A] 1-10 * example 1 *;
 [A]WO9814174  (VIVORX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]; DESAI NEIL P [US]; TAO CHUNLIN [US];) [A] 1-10 * example 2 *
 [X]  - MASAKI H ET AL, "Generation of active oxygen species from advanced glycation end-products (AGEs) during ultraviolet light A (UVA) irradiation and a possible mechanism for cell damaging", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA (BBA) - GENERAL SUBJ, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990628), vol. 1428, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0304-4165(99)00056-2, ISSN 0304-4165, pages 45 - 56, XP004276329 [X] 5,6 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-4165(99)00056-2
 [X]  - A. RIEDL ET AL, "Differing features of proteins in membranes may result in antioxidant or prooxidant action: opposite effects on lipid peroxidation of alcohol dehydrogenase and albumin in liposomal systems", REDOX REPORT., GB, (19960213), vol. 2, no. 1, doi:10.1080/13510002.1996.11747024, ISSN 1351-0002, pages 35 - 40, XP055559736 [X] 5,6 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/13510002.1996.11747024
by applicantUS5714520
 US5731355
 US5731356
 US6028108
 US6100302
 US6147122
 US6177477
 US6399087
 US6469069
 WO9939696
 US5916596
 US6150423
 US6326406
 US6362234
 US5439686
    - BRIGGS et al., Anesthesis, (19820000), vol. 37, page 1099
    - WAUGH et al., Am. J. Hosp. Pharmacists, (19910000), vol. 48, page 1520
    - VALLEJO et al., Am. J. Clin. Oncol., (19960000), vol. 19, no. 6, pages 584 - 8
    - LOPES ROCHA et al., Braz. J. Infect. Dis., (20020000), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 196 - 200
    - KUENEN et al., J. Clin. Oncol., (20020000), vol. 20, no. 6, pages 1657 - 67
    - TAN et al., Anathesia, (19980000), vol. 53, pages 468 - 76
    - MAYER et al., Anaesthesist, (19960000), vol. 45, no. 11, pages 1082 - 4
    - DAVIES et al., Anaesthesia, (20020000), vol. 57, pages 557 - 61
    - DOENICKE et al., Anaesth. Analg., (19960000), vol. 82, pages 472 - 4
    - LARSEN et al., Anaesthesitis, (20010000), vol. 50, pages 842 - 5
    - LILLEY et al., Anaesthesia, (19960000), vol. 51, pages 815 - 8
    - BIELEN et al., Anesth. Analg., (19960000), vol. 82, no. 5, pages 920 - 4
    - KNIBBE et al., Br. J. Clin. Pharmacol., (19990000), vol. 47, no. 6, pages 653 - 60
    - GELDERBLOM et al., Eur. J. of Cancer, (20010000), vol. 37, pages 1590 - 1598
    - TONNER et al., Anesthesiology, (19920000), vol. 77, pages 926 - 931
    - TULLIS, JAMA, (19770000), vol. 237, pages 355 - 360,460-463
    - HOUSER et al., Surgery, Gynecology and Obstetrics, (19800000), vol. 150, pages 811 - 816
    - FINLAYSON, Seminars in Thrombosis and Hemostasis, (19800000), vol. 6, pages 85 - 120
    - FEHSKE et al., Biochem. Pharmcol., (19810000), vol. 30, pages 687 - 92
    - VORUM, Dan. Med. Bull., (19990000), vol. 46, pages 379 - 99
    - KRAGH-HANSEN, Dan. Med. Bull., (19900000), vol. 1441, pages 131 - 40
    - CURRY et al., Nat. Struct. Biol., (19980000), vol. 5, pages 827 - 35
    - SUGIO et al., Protein. Eng., (19990000), vol. 12, pages 439 - 46
    - HE et al., Nature, (19920000), vol. 358, pages 209 - 15
    - CARTER et al., Adv. Protein. Chem., (19940000), vol. 45, pages 153 - 203
    - PAAL et al., Eur. J. Biochem., (20010000), vol. 268, no. 7, pages 2187 - 91
    - PURCELL et al., Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (20000000), vol. 1478, no. 1, pages 61 - 8
    - ALTMAYER et al., Arzheimittelforschung, (19950000), vol. 45, pages 1053 - 6
    - GARRIDO et al., Rev. Esp. Anestestial. Reanim., (19940000), vol. 41, pages 308 - 12
    - URIEN et al., Invest. New Drugs, (19960000), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 147 - 51
    - JUVEN et al., J. Appl. Bacterial., (19940000), vol. 76, no. 6, pages 626 - 31
 US20000446783