Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3406929

EP3406929 - DISC BRAKE FOR A COMMERCIAL VEHICLE AND BRAKE LINING SET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  26.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH
Moosacher Strasse 80
80809 München / DE
[2018/48]
Inventor(s)01 / FRICKE, Jens
Schillerstr. 21
94474 Vilshofen / DE
02 / RGUICHI, Abdelaziz
Anzengruberstr. 10a
Olching 82140 / DE
03 / EICHLER, Thomas
Straßberger Str. 6
80809 München / DE
04 / KRAUSE, Oliver
Königsdorfer Str. 23 B
82515 Wolfratshausen / DE
05 / KLINGNER, Matthias
Jahnstr. 10a
82272 Moorenweis / DE
06 / PESCHEL, Michael
Gisostr. 1
82296 Schöngeising / DE
07 / SCHÖFBERGER, Tobias
Betonienweg 3
84048 Mainburg / DE
08 / ADAMCZYK, Philipp
Oestlestr. 3
87677 Stöttwang / DE
09 / SCHÖNAUER, Manfred
Hochlandstr. 14a
80995 München / DE
10 / PLEINTINGER, Martin
Salzberg 1
94428 Eichendorf / DE
11 / MOLNAR, Markus
Ignaz-Keil-Str. 37
94081 Fürstenzell / DE
12 / GASSLBAUER, Franz
Fabach 9
84381 Johanniskirchen / DE
13 / TROPP, Martin
Königbauer Str. 6
84364 Bad Birnbach / DE
 [2018/48]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/48]
Application number, filing date18178629.414.06.2016
[2018/48]
Priority number, dateDE20151010954015.06.2015         Original published format: DE102015109540
DE20151011728509.10.2015         Original published format: DE102015117285
DE20161010497017.03.2016         Original published format: DE102016104970
[2018/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3406929
Date:28.11.2018
Language:DE
[2018/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.10.2018
ClassificationInternational:F16D65/095, F16D65/092, F16D65/00, F16D55/224, // F16D55/00
[2018/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/27]
Former [2018/48]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SCHEIBENBREMSE FÜR EIN NUTZFAHRZEUG UND BREMSBELAGSATZ[2018/48]
English:DISC BRAKE FOR A COMMERCIAL VEHICLE AND BRAKE LINING SET[2018/48]
French:FREIN À DISQUE POUR UN VÉHICULE UTILITAIRE ET JEU DE GARNITURE DE FREIN[2018/48]
Examination procedure24.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/27]
24.05.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP16728956.0  / EP3308047
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201904   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US4491204  (DIRAUF OTMAR [DE], et al) [X] 13 * column 3, line 64 - column 5, line 47; figure - * [A] 1-7,9,11,12 [Y] 8,10;
 [XAYI]EP2557330  (AKEBONO BRAKE IND [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,7,13 * paragraph [0007]; figure 58 * [A] 4,5,9 [Y] 8,10 [I] 11,12;
 [XAI]US2013256068  (HAZEKI TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,13 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0062]; figure - * [A] 2-8,10 [I] 11,12;
 [XA]JPH09210104  (AKEBONO BRAKE IND) [X] 1,6,13 * abstract * [A] 2-5,7-12;
 [XAI]JP2012189188  (AKEBONO BRAKE IND) [X] 1,2,4-6,13 * abstract * [A] 7-10 [I] 3,11,12;
 [A]JPS57179435  (AKEBONO BRAKE IND) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [XA]DE4430956  (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 13 * column 1, line 35 - line 55; figure - * [A] 1-12
by applicantDE102007001213
 DE102012006111
 DE4301621
 US2014339026