|
04.04.2024 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
04.04.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
22 |
|
04.04.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
22 |
|
04.04.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
22 |
|
04.04.2024 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.04.2024 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.04.2024 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2024 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.2024 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2024 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2024 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.01.2024 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2024 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.01.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.2024 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.01.2024 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.12.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2023 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.12.2023 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.12.2023 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.12.2023 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.12.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
06.12.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
06.12.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
29.11.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
39 |
|
29.11.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
39 |
|
24.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2021 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
38 |
|
12.10.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
84 |
|
12.10.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
84 |
|
06.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 096 |
Opposition |
20 |
|
06.10.2021 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.2021 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2021 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
62 |
|
27.05.2021 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2021 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
65 |
|
27.05.2021 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
66 |
|
18.05.2021 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
65 |
|
11.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 089 |
Opposition |
40 |
|
11.05.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 090 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.05.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 090 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.05.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 091 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 092 |
Opposition |
38 |
|
11.05.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 093 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.05.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 094 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 095 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
11.05.2021 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
59 |
|
11.05.2021 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2020 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.2020 |
Refund of fees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1899 |
|
24.08.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.08.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
13 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 007 |
Opposition |
26 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 010 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 012 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 013 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 014 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 015 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 016 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 017 |
Opposition |
72 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 018 |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 019 |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 019 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 020 |
Opposition |
15 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 021 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 022 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 023 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 024 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 025 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 026 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 027 |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 028 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 029 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 030 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 031 |
Opposition |
41 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 032 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 033 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 034 |
Opposition |
336 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 035 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 036 |
Opposition |
45 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 037 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 038 |
Opposition |
16 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 039 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 040 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 041 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 042 |
Opposition |
53 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 042 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 042 |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 042 |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 042 |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 042 |
Opposition |
18 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 042 |
Opposition |
17 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 043 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 044 |
Opposition |
27 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 045 |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 046 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 047 |
Opposition |
14 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 048 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 049 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 050 |
Opposition |
16 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 051 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 052 |
Opposition |
25 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 053 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 054 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 055 |
Opposition |
26 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 056 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 056 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 057 |
Opposition |
49 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 058 |
Opposition |
19 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 059 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 060 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 061 |
Opposition |
54 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 062 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 063 |
Opposition |
13 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 064 |
Opposition |
19 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 065 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 066 |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 067 |
Opposition |
68 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 068 |
Opposition |
15 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 069 |
Opposition |
33 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 070 |
Opposition |
49 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 071 |
Opposition |
51 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 071 |
Opposition |
26 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 072 |
Opposition |
65 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 072 |
Opposition |
65 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 073 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 074 |
Opposition |
25 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 075 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 076 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 077 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 078 |
Opposition |
15 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 079 |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 080 |
Opposition |
23 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 081 |
Opposition |
60 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 082 |
Opposition |
24 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 083 |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 084 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 085 |
Opposition |
46 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 086 |
Opposition |
16 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 087 |
Opposition |
172 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 088 |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
55 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
17.08.2020 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.07.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
27.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
29.08.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of observations by third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
138 |
|
25.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Citation filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2018 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2018 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2018 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2018 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2018 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2018 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2018 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of observations by third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2018 |
Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
90 |
|
29.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2018 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
29.06.2018 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
29.06.2018 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
45 |