Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3431700

EP3431700 - STABILIZING DEVICE FOR LADDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.09.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  21.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
13.09.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hymer-Leichtmetallbau GmbH & Co. KG
Käferhofen 10
88239 Wangen / DE
[2019/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Boos, Martin
Taunusweg 5
88281 Schlier / DE
02 / Büchele, Volker
Oflinger Weg 6
88239 Wangen / DE
03 / Dentler, Reinhard
Enkenhofen 13
88260 Argenbühl / DE
 [2019/04]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
[2019/04]
Application number, filing date18179468.625.06.2018
[2019/04]
Priority number, dateDE20171011599617.07.2017         Original published format: DE102017115996
[2019/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3431700
Date:23.01.2019
Language:DE
[2019/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.12.2018
ClassificationInternational:E06C7/42, E06C7/44, E06C7/46
[2019/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Former [2019/04]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KIPPSICHERUNG FÜR LEITERN[2019/04]
English:STABILIZING DEVICE FOR LADDERS[2019/04]
French:PROTECTION CONTRE LE BASCULEMENT POUR ÉCHELLES[2019/04]
Examination procedure11.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
11.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Documents cited:Search[XY]US9309718  (MATTHEW MARTIN SINCLAIR [US]) [X] 1,2,6,10 * figures 1, 12-14 * [Y] 4,7;
 [X]US7017711  (ALI SHAIKH MEHBOOB [PK]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10 * figures 7-10, 13-15 *;
 [X]JP2013177784  (ALINCO INC) [X] 1,2,5-7,10 * figures 1, 2, 7, 17, 18 *;
 [X]CN204225755U  (DONGGUAN PRESTIGE SPORTING PRODUCTS CO LTD) [X] 1-6,10 * figures 2, 7 *;
 [Y]KR200172237Y  (LEE WON MYUNG [KR]) [Y] 4,7 * figures 1-3 *