Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473454

EP3473454 - PNEUMATIC TYRES FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Reifen Deutschland GmbH
Vahrenwalder Strasse 9
30165 Hannover / DE
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Funk-Friedek, Sascha
Am Steinbruch 1
30449 Hannover / DE
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Finger, Karsten
Continental Aktiengesellschaft
Patente und Lizenzen
Postfach 169
30001 Hannover / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18182330.309.07.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateDE20171021855018.10.2017         Original published format: DE102017218550
[2019/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473454
Date:24.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:B60C15/06, B60C9/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FAHRZEUGLUFTREIFEN[2019/17]
English:PNEUMATIC TYRES FOR A VEHICLE[2019/17]
French:PNEUMATIQUE DE VÉHICULE[2019/17]
Examination procedure02.09.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/41]
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2017162343  (CONTINENTAL REIFEN DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * page 2, line 9 - line 10 * * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 27 * [I] 14;
 [XP]EP3254870  (CONTINENTAL REIFEN DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1-4,6,8-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0034] *