Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468057

EP3468057 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OPERATING CONTROL CHANNELS FOR BEAMFORMING-BASED WIRELESS COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SEOL, Ji-Yun
208-801 Jeongdeunmaeul Dong-a 2-danji APT. 179
Buljeong-ro
463-751 Bundang-gu / KR
02 / KIM, Tae-Young
308-103 Kkachimaeul Sinwon APT. 177 Migeum-ro
463-739 Bundang-gu / KR
03 / PARK, Jeong-Ho
1-707 Sampung APT. 200 Seochojungang-ro
137-779 Seocho-gu / KR
04 / YU, Hyun-Kyu
2304-1201 Gwanggyo Hanyang Sujain APT. 23
Gwanggyohosu-ro 152beon-gil
443-280 Yeongtong-gu / KR
05 / JEONG, Su-Ryong
503-1704 Heungdeokmaeul 5-danji Hoban Vertium APT.
37 Heungdeok 1-ro 79beon-gil
446- 875 Giheung-gu / KR
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18182758.518.02.2013
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateKR2012001621017.02.2012         Original published format: KR 20120016210
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468057
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/04, H04L5/00, H04B7/06, H04B7/08
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETRIEB VON STEUERKANÄLEN FÜR EINE STRAHLFORMUNGSBASIERTE DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATION[2019/15]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OPERATING CONTROL CHANNELS FOR BEAMFORMING-BASED WIRELESS COMMUNICATION[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER DES COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL BASÉE SUR LA MISE EN FORME DE FAISCEAUX[2019/15]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
01.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/15]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13748676.7  / EP2815519
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
10.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
22.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]US2009318157  (HOSHINO MASAYUKI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0070] *