Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3439245

EP3439245 - DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD BETWEEN A ROTARY INPUT TYPE ENCODER AND A MOTOR CONTROL DEVICE OR AN EVALUATION UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible has been established 
17.05.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 19.06.2019  [2019/25]
17.05.2019Change - designated statespublished on 19.06.2019  [2019/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hengstler GmbH
Uhlandstrasse 49
78554 Aldingen / DE
[2019/06]
Inventor(s)01 / BÜCHER, Johann
Kleeweg 14
78554 Aldingen / DE
02 / LINDEN, Martin
Schützenberg 14
78166 Donaueschingen / DE
03 / KLAIBER, Wolfgang
In der Breite 10
78595 Hausen / DE
 [2019/06]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
[2019/06]
Application number, filing date18183872.317.07.2018
[2019/06]
Priority number, dateDE20171011728831.07.2017         Original published format: DE102017117288
[2019/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3439245
Date:06.02.2019
Language:DE
[2019/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/403, H04L29/08
[2019/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/25]
Former [2019/06]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN ZWISCHEN EINEM DREHWINKELGEBER UND EINER MOTORSTEUEREINRICHTUNG ODER EINER AUSWERTEEINHEIT[2019/06]
English:DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD BETWEEN A ROTARY INPUT TYPE ENCODER AND A MOTOR CONTROL DEVICE OR AN EVALUATION UNIT[2019/06]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES ENTRE UN CAPTEUR D'ANGLE DE ROTATION ET UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR OU UNE UNITÉ D'ÉVALUATION[2019/06]
Examination procedure25.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/25]
13.05.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0249232  (ASCOM POWERLINE COMM AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 2, line 17 - page 9, line 18 * * page 10, line 15 - page 15, line 28 *;
 [A]DE102010052537  (HENGSTLER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0980166  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0010] - [0029] *
by applicantEP2148178