Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3431232

EP3431232 - TERMINAL CUTTER FOR REMOVING TERMINALS FROM A CARRIER STRIP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  21.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019Change - classificationpublished on 04.12.2019 [2019/49]
01.11.2019Change - classificationpublished on 04.12.2019 [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[2019/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Kerstetter, Chadwick Alan
257 Long Lane
Richfield, PA Pennsylvania 17086 / US
02 / Schaeffer, Richard Lloyd, Jr.
18 Donegal Drive
Carlisle, PA Pennsylvania 17013 / US
03 / Moyer, Caleb Andrew
315A Willow Road
Harrisburg, PA Pennsylvania 17109 / US
 [2019/04]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2019/04]
Application number, filing date18183963.017.07.2018
[2019/04]
Priority number, dateUS20171565531420.07.2017         Original published format: US201715655314
[2019/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3431232
Date:23.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.12.2018
ClassificationInternational:B26B17/00, H01R43/04, // H01R43/042, H01R43/045
[2019/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/35]
Former [2019/04]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KLEMMENSCHNEIDER ZUM ENTFERNEN VON KLEMMEN VON EINER TRÄGERLEISTE[2019/04]
English:TERMINAL CUTTER FOR REMOVING TERMINALS FROM A CARRIER STRIP[2019/04]
French:COUPE-BORNES POUR RETIRER LES BORNES D'UNE BANDE DE SUPPORT[2019/04]
Examination procedure19.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.07.2019Examination requested  [2019/35]
19.07.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2812676  (BROWN WALTER C) [X] 1-3,11 * column 2 - column 3; figures 1-5 * [Y] 4,5,10;
 [YA]US4980962  (WIEBE ULRICH [DE]) [Y] 4,5,10 * column 2 - column 4; figures 1,1a * [A] 1;
 [A]US3710610  (MC CAUGHEY W) [A] 1-11 * column 3 - column 5; figure 7 *;
 [A]US4335497  (CASEY DANIEL T) [A] 1-11 * column 3; figures 4,6 *