Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3446712

EP3446712 - CFTR MRNA COMPOSITIONS AND RELATED METHODS AND USES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  25.01.2019
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Translate Bio, Inc.
29 Hartwell Avenue
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
For all designated states
Ethris GmbH
Semmelweisstrasse 3
82152 Planegg / DE
[2019/10]
Former [2019/09]For all designated states
TRANSLATE BIO MA, INC.
29 Hartwell Avenue
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
For all designated states
Ethris GmbH
Semmelweisstrasse 3
82152 Planegg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HEARTLEIN, Michael
c/o Shire Human Genetic Therapies, Inc.
300 Shire Way
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
02 / GUILD, Braydon Charles
109 Riverdale Road
Concord, MA 01742 / US
03 / DEROSA, Frank
c/o Shire Human Genetic Therapies, Inc.
300 Shire Way
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
04 / RUDOLPH, Carsten
Ringweg 4
82152 Krailing / DE
05 / PLANK, Christian
Obere Seefeldstrasse 41
82234 Wessling / DE
06 / SMITH, Lianne
c/o Shire Human Genetic Therapies, Inc.
300 Shire Way
Lexington, MA 02421 / US
 [2019/09]
Representative(s)Goodfellow, Hugh Robin
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2019/09]
Application number, filing date18185286.414.03.2014
[2019/09]
Priority number, dateUS201361783663P14.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361783663 P
[2019/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3446712
Date:27.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/09]
Type: A8 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP3446712
Date:10.04.2019
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.12.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61K47/00, A61K31/7105
[2019/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:CFTR-MRNA-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN SOWIE VERWENDUNGEN[2019/09]
English:CFTR MRNA COMPOSITIONS AND RELATED METHODS AND USES[2019/09]
French:COMPOSITIONS D'ARNM CFTR ET PROCÉDÉS ET UTILISATIONS ASSOCIÉS[2019/09]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14718284.4  / EP2968586
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
24.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
24.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2011012316  (UNIV MUENCHEN L MAXIMILIANS [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-15 * page 22, paragraphs 1-2; example -; claim - *;
 [Y]WO2007024708  (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-15 * example 23; claim - *;
 [Y]WO9914346  (SEQUITUR INC [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-15 * claim - *;
 [Y]WO2008045548  (COPERNICUS THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-15 * example -; claim -; sequences 3, 4 *;
 [YP]WO2013182683  (ETHRIS GMBH [DE]) [YP] 1,2,4-15 * page 6, paragraph 6 - page 8, paragraph 5; example -; claim - *;
 [YP]WO2013185069  (SHIRE HUMAN GENETIC THERAPIES [US], et al) [YP] 1,2,4-15 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]WO2012170930  (SHIRE HUMAN GENETIC THERAPIES [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4-15 * page 31, paragraph 3; example -; claim - *
by applicantWO2007024708
 US2010203627
 US2011035819
 US2009069256
 EP2010659
 US6312926
 US8278036
 WO2011012316
 WO2013182683
 WO2010053572
 WO2012170930
 WO2013063468
 US4897355
 US5171678
 US5334761
 WO2010042877
 WO2005121348
 US5744335
    - ROWE et al., New Engl. J. Med., (20050000), vol. 352, pages 1992 - 2001
    - CONESE et al., J. Cyst. Fibros., (20110000), vol. 10, no. 2, pages 114 - 128
    - ROSENECKER et al., Curr. Opin. Mol. Ther., (20060000), vol. 8, pages 439 - 445
    - ALTON et al., Lancet, (19990000), vol. 353, pages 947 - 954
    - ROSENECKER et al., J Gene Med., (20030000), vol. 5, pages 49 - 60
    - PEARSON, Nature, (20090000), vol. 460, pages 164 - 169
    - ERNST et al., J. Gene Med., (19990000), vol. 1, pages 331 - 340
    - YAMAMOTO, A. et al., Eur. J. Pharm., (20090000), vol. 71, pages 484 - 489
    - DEBUS, H. et al., J. Control Rel., (20100000), vol. 148, pages 334 - 343
    - ANDRIES et al., Mol. Pharmaceut., (20120000), vol. 9, pages 2136 - 2145
    - LIU et al., Journal of Theoretical Biology, (20140000), vol. 344, pages 19 - 30
    - YAMAMOTO Y et al., Biochemistry, (19890000), vol. 28, pages 2728 - 2732
    - KOBER et al., Biotechnol. Bioeng., (20120000), vol. 110, pages 1164 - 1173
    - YOKOE, Nature Biotechnology, (19960000), vol. 14, pages 1252 - 1256
    - FECHTER, P.; BROWNLEE, G.G., "Recognition of mRNA cap structures by viral and cellular proteins", J. Gen. Virology, (20050000), vol. 86, doi:doi:10.1099/VIR.0.80755-0, pages 1239 - 1249, XP002516933

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/VIR.0.80755-0
    - Hum. Gene Ther., (20080900), vol. 19, no. 9, pages 887 - 895
    - LASIC, Trends Biotechnol., (19980000), vol. 16, pages 307 - 321
    - DRUMMOND et al., Pharmacol. Rev., (19990000), vol. 51, pages 691 - 743
    - FEIGNER et al., Proc. Nat'l Acad. Sci., (19870000), vol. 84, page 7413
    - BEHR et al., Proc. Nat. 7 Acad. Sci., (19890000), vol. 86, page 6982
    - SEMPLE et al., Nature Biotech., (20100000), vol. 28, pages 172 - 176
    - HEYES, J. et al., J Controlled Release, (20050000), vol. 107, pages 276 - 287
    - MORRISSEY, DV. et al., Nat. Biotechnol., (20050000), vol. 23, no. 8, pages 1003 - 1007
    - GAO et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Comm., (19910000), vol. 179, page 280
    - WOLF et al., BioTechniques, (19970000), vol. 23, page 139
    - BARNEVELD et al., "Immunochemical analysis of Mutant CFTR in Lung explants", Cell Physiol. Biochem., (20120000), vol. 30, pages 587 - 595
    - VAN BARNEVELD A et al., Cell Physiol Biochem., (20120000), vol. 30, pages 587 - 95