Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3444575

EP3444575 - SENSOR ARRANGEMENT FOR POTENTIOMETRIC MEASUREMENT OF A LEVEL IN A CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.11.2019
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.06.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baumer Electric AG
Hummelstrasse 17
8500 Frauenfeld / CH
[2019/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Fend, Peter
Baumer Electric AG
Hummelstrasse 17
8501 Frauenfeld / CH
02 / Brändle, Daniel
Speicherstr.38
8500 Frauenfeld / CH
 [2019/08]
Representative(s)Strauss, Steffen
Baumer Innotec AG Hummelstrasse 17 Group Intellectual Property
8501 Frauenfeld / CH
[2019/08]
Application number, filing date18185383.925.07.2018
[2019/08]
Priority number, dateDE2017100794614.08.2017         Original published format: DE102017007946
[2019/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3444575
Date:20.02.2019
Language:DE
[2019/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3444575
Date:18.12.2019
Language:DE
[2019/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:G01F23/24
[2019/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/28]
Former [2019/08]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SENSORANORDNUNG ZUR POTENTIOMETRISCHEN MESSUNG EINER FÜLLSTANDSHÖHE IN EINEM BEHÄLTER[2019/08]
English:SENSOR ARRANGEMENT FOR POTENTIOMETRIC MEASUREMENT OF A LEVEL IN A CONTAINER[2019/08]
French:DISPOSITIF CAPTEUR DESTINÉ À LA MESURE POTENTIOMETRIQUE D'UNE HAUTEUR DE NIVEAU DE REMPLISSAGE DANS UN RECIPIENT[2019/08]
Examination procedure28.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/28]
28.05.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.2019Fee for grant paid
11.11.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.11.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Documents cited:Search[XYI]EP1067368  (HELIOS AG [CH]) [X] 1,3,5 * figures 2,3 * * Absätze [0021],[0030] * [Y] 2,4,6 [I] 7-10;
 [A]US4188826  (KANKURA RALF [DE], et al) [A] 3,7 * figure 1 * * column 6, line 64 - line 68 *;
 [Y]  - FERRAN REVERTER ET AL, "Stability and accuracy of active shielding for grounded capacitive sensors", MEASUREMENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY., GB, (20060928), vol. 17, no. 11, doi:10.1088/0957-0233/17/11/004, ISSN 0957-0233, pages 2884 - 2890, XP055536781 [Y] 2,4,6 * abstract * * figure 1(b) * * page 2884, column 2, line 3 - line 6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-0233/17/11/004
 [A]  - Wikipedia, "Buffer Amplifier", Wikipedia, (20170606), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Buffer_amplifier&oldid=784124319, (20181219), XP055536597 [A] 4,6 * abstract * * Absatz 'Voltage Buffer' *