blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3496061

EP3496061 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MONITORING AND CONTROLLING SOUND LEVELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  14.06.2019
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 17.07.2019  [2019/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novar GmbH
Dieselstrasse 2
41469 Neuss / DE
[2019/24]
Inventor(s)01 / JANßEN, Robin
Honeywell International Inc.
Intellectual Property - Patent Services
P.O. Box 377
115 Tabor Road
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
 [2019/24]
Representative(s)Houghton, Mark Phillip
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street
Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
[2019/24]
Application number, filing date18185406.825.07.2018
[2019/24]
Priority number, dateUS20171583196405.12.2017         Original published format: US201715831964
[2019/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3496061
Date:12.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.2019
ClassificationIPC:G08B21/18, G08B23/00
[2019/24]
CPC:
G08B21/182 (EP,US); H04R29/002 (US); G08B23/00 (EP,US);
H04S7/301 (US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/24]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG UND STEUERUNG VON SCHALLPEGELN[2019/24]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MONITORING AND CONTROLLING SOUND LEVELS[2019/24]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE SURVEILLANCE ET DE RÉGULATION DE NIVEAUX SONORES[2019/24]
Examination procedure25.07.2018Examination requested  [2019/24]
06.06.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/29]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH0785386  (DAIWA HOME KK) [A] 1-15* abstract *;
 [A]US2002145521  (CHOU PAUL BAO-LUO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0024] *;
 [XI]US2013329863  (BENTLEY JON L [US], et al) [X] 1-5,11-15 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0074] * [I] 5-10;
 [A]US2014362999  (SCHEPER ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0037] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.