Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470413

EP3470413 - COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING, METHODS INVOLVING, AND USES OF NON-NATURAL AMINO ACID LINKED DOLASTATIN DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2019Publication of search reportpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
05.07.2019Change - classificationpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
05.07.2019Change - classificationpublished on 07.08.2019  [2019/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ambrx, Inc.
10975 North Torrey Pines Road, Suite 100
La Jolla CA 92037 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / MIAO, Zhenwei
15887 Sunnyfield Place
San Diego, CA California 92127 / US
02 / ATKINSON, Kyle, C.
2024 Golden Vue Drive
Golden, CO Colorado 80401 / US
03 / BIROC, Sandra
1036 Camellia Drive
Alameda, CA California 94502 / US
04 / BUSS, Timothy
1745 Catalpa Road
Carlsbad, CA California 92011 / US
05 / COOK, Melissa
976 S. Mollison Avenue Apt. 5
El Cajon, CA California 92020 / US
06 / KRAYNOV, Vadim
5457 White Oak Lane
San Diego, CA California 92130 / US
07 / MARSDEN, Robin
6358 Budlong Lake Avenue
San Diego, CA California 92119 / US
08 / PINKSTAFF, Jason
2978 Las Olas Court
Carlsbad, CA California 92009 / US
09 / SKIDMORE, Lillian
6232 Canyon Bluff Court
San Diego, CA California 92121 / US
10 / SUN, Ying
14972 Avenida Venusto 65
San Diego, CA California 92128 / US
11 / SZYDLIK, Angieszka
3050 Rue D'Orleans 283
San Diego, CA California 92110 / US
12 / LOPEZ DE VALENTA, Delia Ianina
13442 Sebago Avenue
Poway, CA California 92064 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Holland, David Christopher
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18185522.224.05.2012
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS201161491146P27.05.2011         Original published format: US 201161491146 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3470413
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3470413
Date:07.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.07.2019
ClassificationInternational:C07D417/12, C07D207/08, C07D401/12, A61K31/427, A61P35/00, C07K5/02, C07K16/30
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT, VERFAHREN MIT UND VERWENDUNG VON MIT NICHTNATÜRLICHEN AMINOSÄUREN VERKNÜPFTEN DOLASTATINDERIVATEN[2019/16]
English:COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING, METHODS INVOLVING, AND USES OF NON-NATURAL AMINO ACID LINKED DOLASTATIN DERIVATIVES[2019/16]
French:COMPOSITIONS CONTENANT, PROCÉDÉS IMPLIQUANT, ET UTILISATIONS D'ACIDES AMINÉS NON NATURELS DÉRIVÉS DE LA DOLASTATINE LIÉE[2019/16]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12793246.5  / EP2714684
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
25.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
25.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]WO03043583  (SEATTLE GENETICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5-14,16,18 * page 61 - page 64 * * page 76 * * example 5 *;
 [A]WO2007002222  (PSMA DEV COMPANY LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5-14,16,18 * figures 6a-6c * * claims 1,31 *;
 [A]WO2004073656  (SEATTLE GENETICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5-14,16,18 * paragraph [[0168]] - paragraph [[0173]] * * paragraph [[0218]] - paragraph [[219]] * * claims 1,49 *;
 [A]US2009047296  (DORONINA SVETLANA O [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5-14,16,18 * the whole document *;
 [T]  - F. TIAN ET AL, "A general approach to site-specific antibody drug conjugates", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20140117), vol. 111, no. 5, doi:10.1073/pnas.1321237111, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1766 - 1771, XP055101730

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1321237111
by applicantEP0188256
 US4671958
 US4659839
 US4414148
 US4699784
 US4680338
 US4569789
 US5252714
 US7807619
 US6423685
 US2004198637
 WO02085923
    - MAYNARD; GEORGIOU, Annu. Rev. Biomed. Eng., (20000000), vol. 2, pages 339 - 76
    - HUDSON, Curr. Opin. Biotechnol., (19980000), vol. 9, pages 395 - 402
    - S-Z HU et al., Cancer Research, (19960000), vol. 56, pages 3055 - 3061
    - SMITH; WATERMAN, Adv. Appl. Math., (19700000), vol. 2, page 482c
    - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, page 443
    - PEARSON; LIPMAN, Proc. Nat'l. Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, page 2444
    - ALTSCHUL et al., Nuc. Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402
    - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410
    - HENIKOFF; HENIKOFF, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, page 10915
    - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5787
    - BATZER et al., Nucleic Acid Res., (19910000), vol. 19, page 5081
    - OHTSUKA et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19850000), vol. 260, pages 2605 - 2608
    - ROSSOLINI et al., Mol. Cell. Probes, (19940000), vol. 8, pages 91 - 98
    - L. WANG et al., Science, (20010000), vol. 292, pages 498 - 500
    - J. CHIN et al., Science, (20030000), vol. 301, pages 964 - 7
    - J. W. CHIN et al., Journal of the American Chemical Society, (20020000), vol. 124, pages 9026 - 9027
    - J. W. CHIN; P. G. SCHULTZ, ChemBioChem, (20020000), vol. 3, no. 11, pages 1135 - 1137
    - J. W. CHIN et al., PNAS United States of America, (20020000), vol. 99, no. 17, pages 11020 - 11024
    - L. WANG; P. G. SCHULTZ, Chem. Comm., (20020000), pages 1 - 11
    - SHAO, J.; TAM, J., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19950000), vol. 117, pages 3893 - 3899
    - H. HANG; C. BERTOZZI, Acc. Chem. Res., (20010000), vol. 34, no. 9, pages 727 - 736
    - JENCKS, W. P., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19590000), vol. 81, pages 475 - 481
    - SHAO, J.; TAM, J. P., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19950000), vol. 117, no. 14, pages 3893 - 3899
    - CORNISH, V. W. et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19960000), vol. 118, pages 8150 - 8151
    - GEOGHEGAN, K. F.; STROH, J. G., Bioconjug. Chem., (19920000), vol. 3, pages 138 - 146
    - MAHAL, L. K. et al., Science, (19970000), vol. 276, pages 1125 - 1128
    - ZHANG, Z. et al., Biochemistry, (20030000), vol. 42, pages 6735 - 6746
    - GAERTNER, Bioconjug. Chem., (19920000), vol. 3, pages 262 - 268
    - GEOGHEGAN, K.; STROH, J., Bioconjug. Chem., (19920000), vol. 3, pages 138 - 146
    - GAERTNER et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19940000), vol. 269, pages 7224 - 7230
    - HUISGEN, 1,3-DIPOLAR CYCLOADDITION CHEMISTRY, (19840000), pages 1 - 176
    - CHIN et al., Science, (20030000), vol. 301, pages 964 - 7
    - WANG et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20030000), vol. 125, pages 3192 - 3193
    - CHIN et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20020000), vol. 124, pages 9026 - 9027
    - TORNOE et al., J. Org. Chem., (20020000), vol. 67, pages 3057 - 3064
    - ROSTOVTSEV, Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20020000), vol. 41, pages 2596 - 2599
    - LIU, D.R.; SCHULTZ, P.G., "Progress toward the evolution of an organism with an expanded genetic code", PNAS United States, (19990000), vol. 96, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.96.9.4780, pages 4780 - 4785, XP001040352

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.9.4780
    - STEMMER, "Rapid evolution of a protein in vitro by DNA shuffling", Nature, (19940000), vol. 370, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1038/370389a0, pages 389 - 391, XP002082182

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/370389a0
    - STEMMER, "DNA shuffling by random fragmentation and reassembly: In vitro recombination for molecular evolution", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19940000), vol. 91, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.91.22.10747, pages 10747 - 10751, XP002912215

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.22.10747
    - Bioconjugat Chem., (20020000), vol. 13, no. 4, pages 855 - 869
    - THERASSE et al., J. Natl. Cancer Inst., vol. 92, no. 3, (20000202), pages 205 - 16, URL: http://ctep.cancer.gov/forms/TherasseRECISTJNCI.pdf