blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3471102 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201610555070 CN201610628752 CN201610976441 CN201710026008 CN201710036121 CN201710040607 CN201710044103 CN201710135824 CN201710151469 CN201710290037

More

CN201810851081 EP16175005 EP16193920 EP16200527 EP16201335 EP16203971 EP17152172 EP18185124 EP18186022



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019115086Global Dossier 18.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
TW107116684 16.05.2018
US201816113265 27.08.2018
US201762571833 13.10.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019115076Global Dossier 18.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201815989382 25.05.2018
US201762571833 13.10.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019114144Global Dossier 18.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201816047343 27.07.2018
US201762571833 13.10.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019006378Global Dossier 03.01.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201816122898 06.09.2018
US201762571833 13.10.2017
US201615252244 31.08.2016
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10262746Global Dossier 16.04.2019B2
US2017207228 20.07.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201615252244 31.08.2016
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10255980Global Dossier 09.04.2019B2
US2018190357 05.07.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201615352609 16.11.2016
US201815905802 26.02.2018
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10121550Global Dossier 06.11.2018B2
US2017206976 20.07.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201715397043 03.01.2017
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10096368Global Dossier 09.10.2018B2
US2018261294 13.09.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201815978363 14.05.2018
US201715397043 03.01.2017
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10038003Global Dossier 31.07.2018B2
US2017207230 20.07.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201615384323 20.12.2016
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9941011Global Dossier 10.04.2018B2
US2017206968 20.07.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201615352609 16.11.2016
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9847133Global Dossier 19.12.2017B2
US2017206970 20.07.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201615150440 10.05.2016
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9812212Global Dossier 07.11.2017B2
US2017206975 20.07.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201715408434 18.01.2017
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9805776Global Dossier 31.10.2017B2
US2017206945 20.07.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201615381089 15.12.2016
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9792993Global Dossier 17.10.2017B2
US2017206969 20.07.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201715406802 16.01.2017
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9786340Global Dossier 10.10.2017B2
US2017206941 20.07.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201615347158 09.11.2016
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9653173Global Dossier 16.05.2017B1
Priority number Date
US201615368658 04.12.2016
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9520196Global Dossier 13.12.2016B1
Priority number Date
US201615152047 11.05.2016
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6566975BGlobal Dossier 28.08.2019B2
JP2017139045 10.08.2017A
Priority number Date
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6392379BGlobal Dossier 19.09.2018B2
JP2018101767 28.06.2018A
Priority number Date
US201615384323 20.12.2016
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6285001BGlobal Dossier 28.02.2018B2
JP2017130646 27.07.2017A
Priority number Date
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2017130247Global Dossier 27.07.2017A
JP6122531B 26.04.2017B1
Priority number Date
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3410440Global Dossier 05.12.2018A1
Priority number Date
EP16201335 30.11.2016
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3330968Global Dossier 09.10.2019B1
EP3330968 06.06.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201615368658 04.12.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3197051Global Dossier 26.07.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3196886Global Dossier 26.07.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3196885Global Dossier 27.03.2019B1
EP3196885 26.07.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3196884Global Dossier 26.07.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3196883Global Dossier 04.09.2019B1
EP3196883 26.07.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108320772Global Dossier 24.07.2018A
Priority number Date
US201715406802 16.01.2017
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108206186Global Dossier 26.06.2018A
Priority number Date
US201615384323 20.12.2016
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108154898Global Dossier 12.06.2018A
Priority number Date
US201615368658 04.12.2016
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN107017023Global Dossier 04.08.2017A
Priority number Date
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN106981492Global Dossier 25.07.2017A
Priority number Date
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN106981311BGlobal Dossier 30.08.2019B
CN106981311 25.07.2017A
Priority number Date
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN106981309Global Dossier 25.07.2017A
Priority number Date
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN106981307Global Dossier 25.07.2017A
Priority number Date
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN106981304Global Dossier 25.07.2017A
Priority number Date
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN106981299Global Dossier 25.07.2017A
Priority number Date
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TW201727651 01.08.2017A
TWI578322B 11.04.2017B
Priority number Date
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TW201727838 01.08.2017A
TWI587455B 11.06.2017B
Priority number Date
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TW201828302 01.08.2018A
TWI613654B 01.02.2018B
Priority number Date
US201715406802 16.01.2017
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TW201822212 16.06.2018A
TWI613659B 01.02.2018B
Priority number Date
US201615368658 04.12.2016
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TWI613672B 01.02.2018B
TW201727632 01.08.2017A
Priority number Date
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TWI614763B 11.02.2018B
TW201740374 16.11.2017A
Priority number Date
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TWI618072B 11.03.2018B
TW201727649 01.08.2017A
Priority number Date
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TWI621123B 11.04.2018B
TW201801084 01.01.2018A
Priority number Date
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TWI630615B 21.07.2018B
TW201737256 16.10.2017A
Priority number Date
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TWI641115B 11.11.2018B
TW201830665 16.08.2018A
Priority number Date
US201715408434 18.01.2017
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TWI646665B 01.01.2019B
TW201824520 01.07.2018A
Priority number Date
US201615384323 20.12.2016
US201662280683 19.01.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TW201916330 16.04.2019A
Priority number Date
US201815989382 25.05.2018
US201762571833 13.10.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2019075184Global Dossier 16.05.2019A
Priority number Date
US201762571833 13.10.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN109671457Global Dossier 23.04.2019A
Priority number Date
US201762571833 13.10.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3471102Global Dossier 17.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201762571833 13.10.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW201916055 16.04.2019A
TWI652683B 01.03.2019B
Priority number Date
US201762571833 13.10.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW201915714 16.04.2019A
Priority number Date
US201762571833 13.10.2017