Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471102

EP3471102 - RANDOM CODE GENERATOR WITH DIFFERENTIAL CELLS AND ASSOCIATED CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.10.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
eMemory Technology Inc.
Room 305, No. 47 Park Avenue II Rd. Hsinchu Science Park Hsin-Chu
30075 / TW
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Lin, Chun-Hung
7F., No. 19-10, Aly.6, Ln. 14
Niupu Rd., Xiangshan Dist.
300 Hsinchu City / TW
02 / Lu, Chun-Hung
12F., No. 335, Sec. 2
Gongdao 5th Rd
300 Hsinchu City / TW
03 / Huang, Shih-Chan
8F.-2, No. 275, Aikou 3rd St.
Zhubei City
302 Hsinchu County / TW
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Krauns, Christian
Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Zweibrückenstraße 5-7
80331 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18186022.227.07.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS201762571833P13.10.2017         Original published format: US 201762571833 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471102
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:G11C17/16, G11C17/18
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/47]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUFALLSCODEGENERATOR MIT DIFFERENTIELLEN ZELLEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGES STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN[2019/16]
English:RANDOM CODE GENERATOR WITH DIFFERENTIAL CELLS AND ASSOCIATED CONTROL METHOD[2019/16]
French:GÉNÉRATEUR DE CODE ALÉATOIRE COMPORTANT DES CELLULES DIFFÉRENTIELLES ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ASSOCIÉ[2019/16]
Examination procedure16.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/47]
16.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[YA]US2017200508  (GRIGORIEV GRIGORI [CA], et al) [Y] 1,9 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0059]; figure 7 * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0075]; figure 8 * [A] 2-8,10-15;
 [YA]US2009251942  (DAMIEN JOEL [FR]) [Y] 1,9 * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0066]; figure 3 * [A] 2-8,10-15;
 [AD]US9613714  (WONG WEI-ZHE [TW], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS9613714