blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3605384

EP3605384 - A DEVICE AND A METHOD FOR DETECTING VEHICLE LIGHTS IN AN IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.03.2021
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.08.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  03.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2025New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aptiv Technologies AG
Spitalstrasse 5
8200 Schaffhausen / CH
[2024/39]
Former [2024/18]For all designated states
Aptiv Technologies AG
Pestalozzistrasse 2
8200 Schaffhausen / CH
Former [2023/13]For all designated states
Aptiv Technologies Limited
The Financial Services Centre
Bishop's Court Hill
St. Michael / BB
Former [2020/06]For all designated states
Aptiv Technologies Limited
Erin Court
Bishop's Court Hill
St. Michael / BB
Inventor(s)01 / Heift, Monika
Küllenhahner Straße 36
42340 Wuppertal / DE
02 / Friedrichs, Klaus
Baroper Straße 239 c
44227 Dortmund / DE
03 / Paus, Andre
Holunderweg 17
42111 Wuppertal / DE
 [2020/06]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
[2020/06]
Application number, filing date18187237.503.08.2018
[2020/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3605384
Date:05.02.2020
Language:EN
[2020/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.2019
ClassificationIPC:G06K9/00, G06T5/00
[2020/06]
CPC:
G06T5/90 (EP,US); G06T7/0002 (CN); G06F18/214 (CN);
G06F18/24 (CN); G06T5/70 (CN); G06T7/70 (EP);
G06V10/50 (CN); G06V20/56 (CN); G06V20/584 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP); G06T2207/20081 (CN); G06T2207/30252 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/37]
Former [2020/06]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON FAHRZEUGLICHTERN AUF EINEM BILD[2020/06]
English:A DEVICE AND A METHOD FOR DETECTING VEHICLE LIGHTS IN AN IMAGE[2020/06]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTECTER LES FEUX D'UN VÉHICULE DANS UNE IMAGE[2020/06]
Examination procedure03.08.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.08.2020Examination requested  [2020/37]
03.08.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.03.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2024Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.01.2025Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2022Renewal fee patent year 05
29.08.2023Renewal fee patent year 06
28.08.2024Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1837803  (MOBILEYE TECHNOLOGIES LTD [CY]);
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.