Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470767

EP3470767 - VARIABLE THICKNESS FLYER PLATE FOR PENETRATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.02.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
20.08.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ALBERT, Jeremie J.
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US
02 / MUHA, Nicholas B.
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US
03 / THOMAS, Robert W.
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-1596 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Lissandrini, Marco
Bugnion S.p.A. Via Pancaldo 68
37138 Verona / IT
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Lissandrini, Marco
Bugnion S.p.A. Via Pancaldo 68
37138 Verona / IT
Application number, filing date18188497.410.08.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS20171578517616.10.2017         Original published format: US201715785176
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470767
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:F42B1/02, F42B10/32, F42B12/10, F42B39/20, F42B3/00, B64D25/00, F42B15/38, B64G1/64, F42B10/48
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PLANAR-PLATTE MIT VARIABLER DICKE FÜR PENETRATIONSVORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:VARIABLE THICKNESS FLYER PLATE FOR PENETRATION DEVICE[2019/16]
French:PLAQUE À AILETTE D'ÉPAISSEUR VARIABLE POUR DISPOSITIF DE PÉNÉTRATION[2019/16]
Examination procedure10.08.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
11.02.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US5044282  (FUCHS BRIAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,9 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 67; figures 1-4 * [Y] 11-15 [I] 4,5,8,10;
 [X]US5223666  (DELANEY JR JOHN E [US]) [X] 1,2,7,9 * column 2, line 64 - column 4, line 35; figures 1-8 *;
 [X]US9022116  (BELL WILLIAM T [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9 * column 5, line 33 - column 8, line 28; figures 1-6 *;
 [XA]US5322020  (BERNARD MARCEL [FR], et al) [X] 1,3,7 * column 2, line 55 - column 4, line 22; figures 1-6 * [A] 8;
 [Y]US3196791  (GUS FRANCIS, et al) [Y] 11-15 * column 1, line 15 - column 1, line 51; figures 1-5 * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 63 *;
 [A]US5117758  (RENZI JOHN R [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-8 *;
 [A]US2016052649  (LONDON ADAM P [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1a-6 *;
 [A]US4649824  (GUAY ROLAND H [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-9 *;
 [A]GB2105825  (FRITZ WERNER IND AUSRUESTUNG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-5 *
 [A]  - CARPENTER ALEXANDER J ET AL, "Linking the equation of state for fiber-reinforced composites to those of the individual fiber and matrix constituents", PROCEDIA ENGINEERING, (20170424), vol. 204, doi:10.1016/J.PROENG.2017.09.785, ISSN 1877-7058, pages 383 - 389, XP085222980 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.proeng.2017.09.785