Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470055

EP3470055 - INTRAVAGINAL DRUG DELIVERY DEVICES FOR THE DELIVERY OF MACROMOLECULES AND WATER-SOLUBLE DRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited
Clonshaugh Industrial Estate
Coolock
Dublin 17 / IE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / WOOLFSON, Aaron, David
17 Bristow Park
Belfast, Antrim BT9 6TF / GB
02 / MALCOLM, Karl
3 Briarwood Park
Gilnahirk
Belfast, Antrim BT5 7HZ / GB
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18190094.526.06.2008
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS20070946299P26.06.2007         Original published format: US 946299 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470055
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/00, A61K38/00, A61K39/00, A61K48/00, A61K39/12, A61K39/21, C07K16/10, C07K14/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR INTRAVAGINALEN AUSGABE VON MAKROMOLEKÜLEN UND WASSERLÖSLICHEN ARZNEIMITTELN[2019/16]
English:INTRAVAGINAL DRUG DELIVERY DEVICES FOR THE DELIVERY OF MACROMOLECULES AND WATER-SOLUBLE DRUGS[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIFS D'ADMINISTRATION INTRAVAGINALE DE MÉDICAMENTS POUR L'ADMINISTRATION DE MACROMOLÉCULES ET DE MÉDICAMENTS HYDROSOLUBLES[2019/16]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08772073.6  / EP2170276
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
18.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
18.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
18.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
18.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
18.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
18.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
18.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
18.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0113780  (FEI TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * figures 7,9 * * claims 1-43 * * page 13, line 21 - page 18, line 28 * * page 22, line 16 - page 27, line 6 *;
 [X]WO9804220  (POPULATION COUNCIL INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * figures 3,4 * * claims 1-34 * * page 9, line 4 - page 23, line 26 *
by applicantUS6436428
 WO0170154
 US5972372
 US6126958
 US5855906
    - M. KAJIHARA et al., J. Cont. Rel., (20000000), vol. 66, pages 49 - 61
    - M. KAJIHARA et al., J. Cont. Rel., (20010000), vol. 73, pages 279 - 291
    - J.M. KEMP et al., Vaccine, (20020000), vol. 20, pages 1089 - 1098
    - S.A. LOFTHOUSE et al., Vaccine, (20020000), vol. 20, pages 1725 - 1732
    - M. MAEDA et al., J. Cont. Rel., (20020000), vol. 84, pages 15 - 25
    - H. MAEDA et al., Int'l. J. Pharm., (20030000), vol. 261, pages 9 - 19
    - M. KAJIHARA et al., Chem. Pharm. Bull., (20030000), vol. 51, pages 15 - 19
    - H. MAEDA et al., J. Cont. Rel., (20030000), vol. 90, pages 59 - 70
    - T. M. JACKANICZ, Vaginal Contraception: New Developments, Harper and Row, (19790000), pages 201 - 212
    - ROUMEN et al., Contraception, (19990000), vol. 59, pages 59 - 62
    - VARTIAINEN et al., Maturitas, (19930000), vol. 17, pages 129 - 137