Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474505

EP3474505 - DATA TRANSMISSION CONTROL METHOD, PASSIVE OPTICAL NETWORK EQUIPMENT, APPARATUS, AND PASSIVE OPTICAL NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / GAO, Bo
Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang
District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18190219.801.07.2014
[2019/17]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474505
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/835, H04B10/25, H04J14/02, H04Q11/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN, VERFAHREN, AUSRÜSTUNG FÜR PASSIVES OPTISCHES NETZWERK SOWIE PASSIVES OPTISCHES NETZWERK[2019/17]
English:DATA TRANSMISSION CONTROL METHOD, PASSIVE OPTICAL NETWORK EQUIPMENT, APPARATUS, AND PASSIVE OPTICAL NETWORK[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES, ÉQUIPEMENT DE RÉSEAU OPTIQUE PASSIF, APPAREIL ET RÉSEAU OPTIQUE PASSIF[2019/17]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14896724.3  / EP3151490
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
11.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US2012008937  (CHENG NING [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * page 1, paragraph 4 - paragraph 9; figures 1,8-11 * * page 2, paragraph 25 - page 4, paragraph 35 * * page 7, paragraph 49 - page 9, paragraph 65 *;
 [A]US8634431  (CHIANG JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 24, line 60 - column 25, line 54; figures 1,2,3,10 *;
 [XP]  - BO GAO FUTUREWEI TECHNOLOGIES, "Draft of G.989.3 Annex H - PtP WDM Transmission Convergence Layer;C", ITU-T DRAFT ; STUDY PERIOD 2013-2016, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA ; CH, (20140907), vol. 2/15, pages 1 - 27, XP044077283 [XP] 1-18 * Post-published document - c.f. Section H.6.1 and H.6.2 *
 [XP]  - "Phoneline networking transceivers - Isolation function; G.989.3 (10/15)", no. G.989.3 (10/15), (20151022), pages 1 - 250, ITU-T STANDARD, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA ; CH, URL: http://mirror.itu.int/dms/pay/itu-t/rec/g/T-REC-G.989.3-201510-I!!PDF-E.pdf, (20160704), XP044172662 [XP] 1-18 * post published document cf. section 16.2.1 and 16.2.2 *