Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466955

EP3466955 - METHOD OF PREPARING OXAZOLO[4,5-B]PYRIDINE AND THIAZOLO[4,5-B]PYRIDINE DERIVATIVES AS IRAK4 INHIBITORS FOR TREATING CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aurigene Discovery Technologies Limited
39-40 KIADB Industrial Area
Electronic City Phase-II
Hosur Road
Bangalore 560100 / IN
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / GUMMADI, Venkateshwar, Rao
Balaji Nilayam 62 1st main
Veerabhadraswamylayout
Doddanagamangala
Electronic City
Bangalore 560100 / IN
02 / SAMAJDAR, Susanta
Flat R801 H. M Tambourine
Jaraganahalli
J.P. Nagar 6th Phase
Bangalore 560078 / IN
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
4th Floor
Merchant Exchange
17-19 Whitworth Street West
Manchester M1 5WG / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18190333.712.01.2015
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateIN2014CHE15813.01.2014         Original published format: IN 158CH2014
IN2014CHE300020.06.2014         Original published format: IN 3000CH2014
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466955
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:C07D498/04, C07D513/04, A61K31/437, A61P35/00
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OXAZOLO[4,5-B]PYRIDIN- UND THIAZOLO[4,5-B]PYRIDIN-DERIVATEN ALS IRAK4-INHIBITOREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS[2019/15]
English:METHOD OF PREPARING OXAZOLO[4,5-B]PYRIDINE AND THIAZOLO[4,5-B]PYRIDINE DERIVATIVES AS IRAK4 INHIBITORS FOR TREATING CANCER[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉPARATION DE DÉRIVÉS DE OXAZOLO[4,5-B]PYRIDINE ET THIAZOLO[4,5-B]PYRIDINE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE IRAK4 POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER[2019/15]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15735499.4  / EP3094329
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2013042137  (AURIGENE DISCOVERY TECH LTD [IN], et al) [A] 1-28 * page 27 to page 31: schemes 1 to 6 * * page 37 to page 80: examples: synthesis of compounds 1 to 58 * * page 80 to page 82: biological activity: tables * * claims 1, 13, 15, 15, 18, 20 *;
 [A]WO2010071819  (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * page 1, line 4 - line 10 * * page 47 and page 48: schemes 2 and 3 * * page 51 to page 106: examples 4 to 167: preparation of compounds 4 to 171 * * pages 107 and 108: examples 168 to 170 * * claims 1, 34, 24-27, 31, 33-37 *
by applicantWO2008030579
 WO2008030584
 WO2011043371
    - JANSSENS, S et al., Mol. Cell., (20030000), vol. 11, pages 293 - 302
    - KANAKARAJ et al., J. Exp. Med., (19990000), vol. 189, no. 7, pages 1129 - 38
    - YANG et al., J. Immunol., (19990000), vol. 163, pages 639 - 643
    - KANAKARAJ et al., J. Exp. Med., (19980000), vol. 187, no. 12, pages 2073 - 2079
    - XIAOXIA LI et al., Mol. Cell. Biol., (19990000), vol. 19, no. 7, pages 4643 - 4652
    - LI S et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20020000), vol. 99, no. 8, pages 5567 - 5572
    - LYE, E et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20040000), vol. 279, no. 39, pages 40653 - 8
    - WIETEK C et al., Mol. Interv., (20020000), vol. 2, pages 212 - 215
    - SUZUKI et al., Nature, (20020000), vol. 416, no. 6882, pages 750 - 756
    - MEDVEDEV et al., J. Exp. Med., (20030000), vol. 198, no. 4, pages 521 - 531
    - PICARD et al., Science, (20030000), vol. 299, no. 5615, pages 2076 - 2079
    - KIM TW et al., J Exp Med, (20070000), vol. 204, pages 1025 - 36
    - KAWAGOE T et al., J Exp Med, (20070000), vol. 204, no. 5, pages 1013 - 1024
    - KOZICZAK-HOLBRO M et al., J Biol Chem, (20070000), vol. 282, no. 18, pages 13552 - 13560
    - KIRK A et al., The Journal of Immunology, (20090000), vol. 183, no. 1, pages 568 - 577
    - GEORGE M BUCKLEY et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20080000), vol. 18, no. 11, pages 3211 - 3214
    - POWERS JP et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20060000), vol. 16, no. 11, pages 2842 - 2845
    - BUCKLEY G M et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20080000), vol. 18, no. 11, pages 3656 - 3660
    - BUCKLEY G et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (20080000), vol. 18, no. 11, pages 3291 - 3295