Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466418

EP3466418 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MODULATING METABOLIC PATHWAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NuSirt Sciences, Inc.
3835 Cleghorn Avenue
Suite 200
Nashville, TN 37215 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ZEMEL, Michael
7226 Canmore Lane
Knoxvillel, TN Tennessee 37919 / US
02 / GRINDSTAFF, E., Douglas, II
107 Chatsworth Dr
Nashville, Tennessee 37215 / US
03 / BRUCKBAUER, Antje
10744 Meriwether Lane
Knoxville, TN Tennessee 37934 / US
 [2019/22]
Former [2019/15]01 / ZEMEL, Michael
7226 Canmore Lane
Knoxvillel, TN Tennessee 37919 / US
02 / GRINDSTAFF, E., Douglas, II
3629 West End Avenue
Nashville, TN Tennessee 37205 / US
03 / BRUCKBAUER, Antje
10744 Meriwether Lane
Knoxville, TN Tennessee 37934 / US
Representative(s)Avidity IP
Broers Building
Hauser Forum
21 JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date18190431.913.07.2012
[2019/15]
Priority number, dateUS201161508139P15.07.2011         Original published format: US 201161508139 P
US201261636608P20.04.2012         Original published format: US 201261636608 P
US201261636603P20.04.2012         Original published format: US 201261636603 P
US201261636610P20.04.2012         Original published format: US 201261636610 P
US201261636598P20.04.2012         Original published format: US 201261636598 P
US201261636605P20.04.2012         Original published format: US 201261636605 P
US201261636597P20.04.2012         Original published format: US 201261636597 P
[2019/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466418
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/195, A61K45/06, A61K31/19, A61K31/155, A61K31/426
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR MODULIERUNG VON METABOLISCHEN SIGNALWEGEN[2019/15]
English:COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MODULATING METABOLIC PATHWAYS[2019/15]
French:COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR MODULER LES VOIES MÉTABOLIQUES[2019/15]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12814141.3  / EP2731599
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
14.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
14.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
14.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201908   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2009093502  (PETERS JASON [CA], et al) [X] 1-8,14,15 * paragraphs [0059] - [0061]; example 3 *;
 [X]WO2004056208  (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-6,14 * page 12; example 3 *;
 [X]JP2008291002  ;
 [Y]WO2005065667  (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,6-15 * page 2 *;
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2008, no. 82, Database accession no. 2008-O11809, XP002788325 & JP2008291002 A 20081204 (HOUSE WELLNESS FOODS CORP LTD) [X] 1-6,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] *
 [Y]  - YAZMIN MACOTELA ET AL, "Dietary Leucine - An Environmental Modifier of Insulin Resistance Acting on Multiple Levels of Metabolism", PLOS ONE, (20110622), vol. 6, no. 6, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0021187, page e21187, XP055361022 [Y] 1-15 * page 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0021187
 [Y]  - SUN XIAOCUN ET AL, "Leucine modulation of mitochondrial mass and oxygen consumption in skeletal muscle cells and adipocytes", NUTRITION & METABOLISM, BIOMED CENTRAL. LONDON, GB, (20090605), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1743-7075-6-26, ISSN 1743-7075, page 26, XP021059721 [Y] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1743-7075-6-26
 [Y]  - M. KOMATSU ET AL, "Triggering of Insulin Release by a Combination of cAMP Signal and Nutrients : An ATP-Sensitive K+ Channel-Independent Phenomenon", DIABETES, US, (20020201), vol. 51, no. Supplement 1, doi:10.2337/diabetes.51.2007.S29, ISSN 0012-1797, pages S29 - S32, XP055546906 [Y] 1-9,11-15 * page 32 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.51.2007.S29
 [Y]  - SCHAUDER P ET AL, "Somatostatin and insulin release from isolated rat pancreatic islets in response to D-glucose, L-leucine, @a-ketoisocaproic acid or D-glyceraldehyde: Evidence for a regulatory role of adenosine-3',5'-cyclic monophosphate", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 75, no. 3, doi:10.1016/0006-291X(77)91519-4, ISSN 0006-291X, (19770411), pages 630 - 635, (19770411), XP024769257 [Y] 1-7,11-15 * tables 1-2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(77)91519-4
 [YP]  - ANTJE BRUCKBAUER ET AL, "Effects of dairy consumption on SIRT1 and mitochondrial biogenesis in adipocytes and muscle cells", NUTRITION & METABOLISM, BIOMED CENTRAL. LONDON, GB, (20111220), vol. 8, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1743-7075-8-91, ISSN 1743-7075, page 91, XP021093927 [YP] 1,2,6-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1743-7075-8-91
 [XP]  - ANTJE BRUCKBAUER ET AL, "Synergistic effects of leucine and resveratrol on insulin sensitivity and fat metabolism in adipocytes and mice", NUTRITION & METABOLISM, BIOMED CENTRAL. LONDON, GB, (20120822), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1743-7075-9-77, ISSN 1743-7075, page 77, XP021122177 [XP] 1,2,6-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1743-7075-9-77
 [T]  - ANTJE BRUCKBAUER ET AL, "Synergistic Effects of Polyphenols and Methylxanthines with Leucine on AMPK/Sirtuin-Mediated Metabolism in Muscle Cells and Adipocytes", PLOS ONE, (20140214), vol. 9, no. 2, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0089166, page e89166, XP055219903 [T] * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0089166
by applicantUS2011165125
 US6004996
 US2010210692
 US2010009992
 US2007244202
 US2008176822
 US2007014833
 US2009163476
 US2009105246
 US7829556
 US7855289
 US7893086
 US8044198
 US8088928
 US8093401
 US7230009
 US6369042
 US7495101
 US7109198
 US2009142336
 US2006051416
 US2007065512
 US4606909
 US4769027
 US4897268
 US5395626
 US6919373
 US6923800
 US6929803
 US6939556
 US6797283
 US6764697
 US6635268
    - N Engl J Med, (20110000), vol. 364, pages 829 - 841
    - PARK, "Resveratrol Ameliorates Aging-Related Metabolic Phenotypes by Inhibiting cAMP Phosphodiesterases", Cell, (20120203), vol. 148, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cell.2012.01.017, pages 421 - 433, XP028397795

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2012.01.017
    - HOWITZ et al., Nature, (20030000), vol. 425, page 191
    - PETERSON D L; MARTINEZ-CARRION M, "The mechanism of transamination. Function of the histidyl residue at the active site of supernatant aspartate transaminase", J Biol Chem., (19700225), vol. 245, no. 4, pages 806 - 13
    - LIND et al., "Evaluation of four different methods to measure endothelium-dependent vasodilation in the human peripheral circulation", Clinical Science, (20020000), vol. 102, pages 561 - 567
    - FEIGE J; LAGOUGE M; CANTO C; STREHLE A; HOUTEN SM; MILNE JC; LAMBERT PD; MATAKI C; ELLIOTT PJ; AUWERX J, "Specific SIRT1 activation mimics low energy levels and protects against diet-induced metabolic disorders by enhancing fat oxidation", Cell Metabolism, (20080000), vol. 8, pages 347 - 358
    - SUN X; ZEMEL MB, "Leucine modulation of mitochondrial mass and oxygen consumption in skeletal muscle cells and adipocytes", Nutrition and Metabolism, (20090000), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1186/1743-7075-6-26, page 26, XP021059721

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1743-7075-6-26
    - BOSTROM et al., Nature, (20120000), vol. 481, pages 463 - 468