Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3470851 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3470851



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 148
02.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.10.2019 Statement of non-availability of priority search results Search / examination 1
23.09.2019 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
10.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.09.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
10.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
10.09.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 14
10.09.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 15
10.09.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
10.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.04.2019 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
20.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
26.02.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.02.2019 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 35
26.02.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 4
26.02.2019 European search report Search / examination 2
26.02.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
11.02.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
24.08.2018 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
24.08.2018 Priority document Search / examination 23
23.08.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.08.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
23.08.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
23.08.2018 Description Search / examination 14
23.08.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.08.2018 Drawings Search / examination 3
23.08.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4