Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3470851


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.09.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
13.09.2019 Request for examination filed published on  16.10.2019  [2019/42]
13.09.2019 Change - designated states published on  16.10.2019  [2019/42]
11.09.2019 Amendment by applicant
15.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
24.08.2018 Change - representative