Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470851

EP3470851 - A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING FUNCTIONS OF A MEASUREMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.09.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
13.09.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
13.09.2019Change - designated statespublished on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG
Mühldorfstrasse 15
81671 München / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DING, Alvin
808C Chai Chee Road No. 15-66
463808 Singapore / SG
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18190539.923.08.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateDE20171021823312.10.2017         Original published format: DE102017218233
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470851
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:G01R1/02, G06F3/01, // G01R31/28
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/42]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER FUNKTIONEN EINER MESSVORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING FUNCTIONS OF A MEASUREMENT APPARATUS[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMANDER LES FONCTIONS D'UN APPAREIL DE MESURE[2019/16]
Examination procedure10.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.09.2019Examination requested  [2019/42]
10.09.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2013127904  (DOVE ANDREW P [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,12 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0123]; figures 1-9 * [I] 8,10,11;
 [X]CN106908643  (SUZHOU RIGOL PREC ELECTRIC TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,9 * abstract *;
 [A]US2014195980  (LEE HAE-IN [KR]) [A] 1,9 * abstract *;
 [A]US2017083086  (MAZUR KAI [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * abstract *