Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473188

EP3473188 - FACETED BONE SCREW [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.11.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medical Facets LLC
22 Second Avenue
Port Washington, NY 11050 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Rupp, Glenn
231 Mays Mills Drive
Cramerton, NC 28032 / US
02 / Duquette, Scott
2003 GreenBrier Lane
Clemmons, NC 27012 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Harding, Andrew Philip
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Patel, Binesh , et al
Forresters IP LLP
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Application number, filing date18191313.812.02.2013
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS20121337216113.02.2012         Original published format: US201213372161
[2019/17]
Previously filed application, dateWO2013US2566412.02.2013
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473188
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/04, A61B17/86, A61F2/08
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:FACETTIERTE KNOCHENSCHRAUBE[2019/17]
English:FACETED BONE SCREW[2019/17]
French:VIS À OS À FACETTES[2019/17]
Examination procedure19.11.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13749296.3  / EP2814402
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
04.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[I]US2009131989  (WILLERT WAYNE A [US], et al) [I] 1,2 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [0026]; figures 2a,2b; claims 8,10 *;
 [A]EP2233108  (ASTRA TECH AB [SE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0066]; figure 5a *;
 [A]WO2007074498  (DEOLA SONIA [IT], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantUS7875285
 US7879086
 US8028646
 US7913642
 US7901453