Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470303

EP3470303 - PARKING SUPPORT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 17.04.2019  [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / INDOH, Yuichi
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
02 / KIDA, Yusuke
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18191511.729.08.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateJP2017017077506.09.2017         Original published format: JP 2017170775
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470303
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:B62D15/02
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PARKHILFEVORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:PARKING SUPPORT DEVICE[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SUPPORT DE PARKING[2019/16]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
29.08.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2016075327  (KIYOKAWA YUSUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0064]; figures 1-11; claims 1-6 * [A] 2-6 [I] 7,8;
 [XAI]EP2428431  (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1-6 * [A] 2-5 [I] 7,8;
 [A]DE102015212581  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1-3; claim 2 *;
 [AP]US2018111608  (KIM JAE SUK [KR]) [AP] 1-8 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0109]; figures 1-8 *
by applicantJP2014166834
 JP2012217000
 JP2013105179
 JP2015003565