Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473288

EP3473288 - NASAL MASK INTERFACE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fisher & Paykel Healthcare Limited
O'Hare Building
15 Maurice Paykel Place
East Tamaki
Auckland 2013 / NZ
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / PRENTICE, Craig Robert
15 Mayrice Paykel Place
East Tamaki
2013 Auckland / NZ
02 / IP, Bernard Tsz Lun
15 Maurice Paykel Place
East Tamaki
2013 Auckland / NZ
03 / BOYES, Richard
15 Maurice Paykel Place
East Tamaki
2013 Auckland / NZ
04 / RICHARDSON, Thomas
15 Maurice Paykel Place
East Tamaki
2013 Auckland / NZ
05 / MCDERMOTT, Gareth
15 Maurice Paykel Place
East Tamaki
2013 Auckland / NZ
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18191822.829.06.2012
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS201161504061P01.07.2011         Original published format: US 201161504061 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473288
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/06, A61M16/08, A61M16/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:SCHNITTSTELLENANORDNUNG FÜR EINE NASALMASKE[2019/17]
English:NASAL MASK INTERFACE ASSEMBLY[2019/17]
French:ENSEMBLE D'INTERFACE POUR MASQUE NASAL[2019/17]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12807770.8  / EP2726132
Divisional application(s)EP19176041.2
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
18.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
18.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
18.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
18.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[I]US2006118117  (BERTHON-JONES MICHAEL [AU], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0218]; figures 53A-53P *;
 [A]EP1982740  (RESMED LTD [AU]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-1,1-2,1-3,4-1,7-1 *;
 [A]US2007163594  (HO PETER C F [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 2,4,6,7 *;
 [A]WO2006074513  (RESMED LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-6,65 *
by applicantWO2012IB00858