Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473359

EP3473359 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL LAMINATING AND SHAPING APPARATUS AND LAMINATING AND SHAPING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Advantest Corporation
1-6-2, Marunouchi
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / SUGATANI, Shinji
c/o ADVANTEST CORPORATION
1-6-2, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 100-0005 / JP
02 / NISHINA, Shigeki
c/o ADVANTEST CORPORATION
1-6-2, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 100-0005 / JP
03 / MATSUMOTO, Jun
c/o ADVANTEST CORPORATION
1-6-2, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 100-0005 / JP
04 / TAKIZAWA, Masahiro
c/o ADVANTEST CORPORATION
1-6-2, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 100-0005 / JP
05 / SOMA, Minoru
c/o ADVANTEST CORPORATION
1-6-2, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 100-0005 / JP
06 / YAMADA, Akio
c/o ADVANTEST CORPORATION
1-6-2, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 100-0005 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Tetzner, Michael , et al
Tetzner & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Van-Gogh-Strasse 3
81479 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Tetzner, Michael , et al
TETZNER & PARTNER mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Van-Gogh-Strasse 3
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date18192172.703.09.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateJP2017020296219.10.2017         Original published format: JP 2017202962
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473359
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:B22F3/105, B33Y10/00, B33Y50/02, B33Y40/00, B29C64/153, B29C64/268
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM DREIDIMENSIONALEN LAMINIEREN UND FORMEN UND LAMINIER- UND FORMVERFAHREN[2019/17]
English:THREE-DIMENSIONAL LAMINATING AND SHAPING APPARATUS AND LAMINATING AND SHAPING METHOD[2019/17]
French:APPAREIL DE LAMINAGE ET DE FORMAGE TRIDIMENSIONNEL ET PROCÉDÉ DE LAMINAGE ET DE FORMAGE[2019/17]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
03.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
27.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2015017054  (JAKIMOV ANDREAS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] , [0 20] , [0 39] - [0049] * * claims 1-20 * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]JP2000124276  (NEC CORP) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0 12] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2013055568  (DUSEL KARL-HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] - [0033] * * claims 21-48 * * figure 1 *
by applicantUS7454262
 JP2015193866
 JP2015182419