Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3456662

EP3456662 - TRACK-BOUND TRANSPORT ROBOT WITH LIFTING PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.05.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heron Innovations Factory GmbH
Dr. Walter Zumtobel Straße 2
6850 Dornbirn / AT
[2019/23]
Former [2019/12]For all designated states
Heron Sondermaschinen und Steuerungen GmbH
Dr. Walter Zumtobel Str. 2
6850 Dornbirn / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Beer, Christian
Linzenberg 43
6858 Schwarzach / AT
 [2019/12]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
[2019/12]
Application number, filing date18192377.204.09.2018
[2019/12]
Priority number, dateDE20171012163819.09.2017         Original published format: DE102017121638
[2019/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3456662
Date:20.03.2019
Language:DE
[2019/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:B65G1/04
[2019/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/26]
Former [2019/12]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHIENENGEBUNDENER TRANSPORTROBOTER MIT HUBPLATTFORM[2019/12]
English:TRACK-BOUND TRANSPORT ROBOT WITH LIFTING PLATFORM[2019/12]
French:ROBOT DE TRANSPORT FERROVIAIRE POURVU DE PLATEFORME DE LEVAGE[2019/12]
Examination procedure17.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/26]
17.05.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH11278607  (MURATA MACHINERY LTD) [X] 1,2,6-8,12,13 * paragraphs [0010] - [0011]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 3,4,9-11,14;
 [X]US4088232  (LILLY GEORGE E) [X] 1,2,6-8 * figures 1-7 *;
 [X]JPH04235822  (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS) [X] 5-8,12,13 * figure 3 *;
 [IY]US8628289  (BENEDICT CHARLES E [US], et al) [I] 1 * column 7, paragraphs 30-58; figure 16 * [Y] 4,11;
 [X]US2016060037  (RAZUMOV SERGEY N [RU]) [X] 1 * figures 1-5 *;
 [Y]DE202007000874U  (BEER CHRISTIAN [AT]) [Y] 3 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *;
 [Y]US2009229498  (HAMBY PAYGE [US]) [Y] 9,10,14 * paragraphs [0038] , [ 0037]; figures 4, 5 *;
 [Y]WO2010080539  (HAMBY PAYGE MARIE [US], et al) [Y] 9,10,14 * page 2, lines 27-32; figures 1-9; claim 2 *;
 [Y]US2014277693  (NAYLOR JOHN R [US]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0057]; figures 28-31 *