Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470508

EP3470508 - DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS HAVING AN IMPROVED PROFILE AGAINST EFFLORESCENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 17.04.2019  [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel IP & Holding GmbH
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Piorkowski, Daniel T
351 Riverside Drive
Fairfield, 06824 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Henkel IP Department
c/o Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstraße 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18192439.004.09.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS20171573094112.10.2017         Original published format: US201715730941
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470508
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:C11D17/04, C11D1/83, C11D3/22, C11D3/20
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VERBESSERTEM PROFIL GEGEN AUSBLÜHUNGEN[2019/16]
English:DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS HAVING AN IMPROVED PROFILE AGAINST EFFLORESCENCE[2019/16]
French:COMPOSITIONS DÉTERGENTES POSSÉDANT UN PROFIL AMÉLIORÉ CONTRE L'EFFLORESCENCE[2019/16]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
04.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Documents cited:Search[XP]WO2018140566  (HENKEL IP & HOLDING GBMH [DE], et al) [XP] 1-9 * tables 5B,6A *;
 [A]WO2017131799  (GRAHAM TROY ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-10 * table 6 *;
 [A]WO2007111888  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 22, line 15 - line 16; example 1 *;
 [A]EP3202880  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0079] *;
 [A]WO2015164515  (SUN PRODUCTS CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0086]; example 1 *;
 [A]EP1120459  (YPLON S A [BE]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-12 *