Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474427

EP3474427 - MANUFACTURING METHOD OF CORE OF ROTATING ELECTRICAL MACHINE, AND CORE OF ROTATING ELECTRICAL MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 24.04.2019  [2019/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / KINPARA, Hiroshi
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi
Aichi-Ken, 471-8571 / JP
02 / TAKAHASHI, Takashi
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi
Aichi-Ken, 471-8571 / JP
03 / SEGAWA, Tomohiro
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi
Aichi-Ken, 471-8571 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18192565.204.09.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateJP2017020194018.10.2017         Original published format: JP 2017201940
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474427
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:H02K15/03, // H02K1/27, H02K1/32
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DEN KERN EINER ROTIERENDEN ELEKTRISCHEN MASCHINE UND KERN EINER ROTIERENDEN ELEKTRISCHEN MASCHINE[2019/17]
English:MANUFACTURING METHOD OF CORE OF ROTATING ELECTRICAL MACHINE, AND CORE OF ROTATING ELECTRICAL MACHINE[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE NOYAU DE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE TOURNANTE ET NOYAU DE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE TOURNANTE[2019/17]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
04.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Documents cited:Search[XAYI]US5255425  (KANNO KAZUNOBU [JP]) [X] 11 * column 5, lines 28-35;; figures 1, 2, 3 * [A] 2,3,6,9 [Y] 8,10 [I] 1,4,5,7;
 [Y]JP2008199831  (AICHI ELEC CO) [Y] 8,10 * abstract *
by applicantJP2016226109