Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470537

EP3470537 - STEEL PLATE MEMBER AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE STEEL PLATE MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.04.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / IHARA, Tomoaki
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
02 / YAMAZAKI, Satoshi
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
03 / OKUMA, Shinobu
c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18192567.804.09.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateJP2017019756211.10.2017         Original published format: JP 2017197562
JP2018008508526.04.2018         Original published format: JP 2018085085
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470537
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2018
ClassificationInternational:C21D7/13, B21D22/02, B21D22/20, C21D9/48, C21D1/18, C21D1/25, C21D1/673
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STAHLPLATTENELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES STAHLPLATTENELEMENTS[2019/16]
English:STEEL PLATE MEMBER AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE STEEL PLATE MEMBER[2019/16]
French:ÉLÉMENT DE PLAQUE D'ACIER ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE L'ÉLÉMENT DE PLAQUE D'ACIER[2019/16]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
04.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
18.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO2016046637  (MAGNA INT INC [CA]) [X] 1,3-5 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0040] * [A] 2;
 [A]US2002104591  (GEHRINGHOFF LUDGER [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013]; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO2011160209  (MAGNA INT INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-5 * figures 7,8; claim 37 *;
 [A]EP2905346  (SCHWARTZ GMBH [DE]) [A] 5 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013]; figures 2-4; claims 1,4 *;
 [AP]EP3323524  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [AP] 1-5 * paragraph [0064]; figure 2A; claims 1,2,4,7 *
 [A]  - MERKLEIN M ET AL, "Herstellung von funktionsoptimierten Bauteilen im Presshärtprozess", STAHL UND EISEN, VERLAG STAHLEISEN, DUSSELDORF, DE, (20100615), vol. 130, no. 6, ISSN 0340-4803, pages 51 - 57, XP001558170 [A] 1-5 * page 55; figure 4 * * page 56, column r; figure 6 *
by applicantJP2012144773