blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3605539

EP3605539 - LOW VOLTAGE REFERENCE CURRENT GENERATOR AND MEMORY DEVICE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.06.2022
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.10.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.06.2022Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.07.2022  [2022/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MACRONIX INTERNATIONAL CO., LTD.
16 Li-Hsin Road, Science-Based Industrial Park
Hsinchu 300 / TW
[2020/06]
Inventor(s)01 / YANG, Shang-Chi
No.92-58, Datu Ln., Erxi Rd., Xihu Township
514 Changhua County / TW
 [2020/06]
Representative(s)Gunzelmann, Rainer
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2020/06]Gunzelmann, Rainer
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date18192695.705.09.2018
[2020/06]
Priority number, dateUS20181605458603.08.2018         Original published format: US201816054586
[2020/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3605539
Date:05.02.2020
Language:EN
[2020/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.2019
ClassificationIPC:G11C7/14, G11C5/14, G11C16/28, G11C16/30
[2020/06]
CPC:
G11C7/14 (EP,US); G11C5/147 (EP,CN,US); G11C11/4099 (US);
G11C16/28 (EP); G11C16/30 (EP); G11C29/028 (US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NIEDERSPANNUNGSREFERENZSTROMGENERATOR UND SPEICHERVORRICHTUNG DAMIT[2020/06]
English:LOW VOLTAGE REFERENCE CURRENT GENERATOR AND MEMORY DEVICE USING SAME[2020/06]
French:GÉNÉRATEUR DE COURANT DE RÉFÉRENCE BASSE TENSION ET DISPOSITIF DE MÉMOIRE UTILISANT CELUI-CI[2020/06]
Examination procedure19.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.11.2019Examination requested  [2020/06]
19.11.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.10.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.03.2022Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2022/30]
23.03.2022Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2022/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1071094  (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) [Y] 10-12* paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0034]; figure 1 *;
 [XYI]WO2014070366  (SILICON STORAGE TECH INC [US]) [X] 1,5-9 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1-5 * [Y] 10-12 [I] 2-4,13,14
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.