blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3471022 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201811203888 EP18192813



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US10007865Global Dossier 26.06.2018B1
Priority number Date
US201715784272 16.10.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20190042452Global Dossier 24.04.2019A
Priority number Date
US201715784272 16.10.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2019075121Global Dossier 16.05.2019A
Priority number Date
US201715784272 16.10.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN109670512Global Dossier 23.04.2019A
Priority number Date
US201715784272 16.10.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3471022Global Dossier 17.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201715784272 16.10.2017