Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471022

EP3471022 - LEARNING METHOD AND LEARNING DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING PARAMETERS OF CNN BY USING MULTI-SCALE FEATURE MAPS AND TESTING METHOD AND TESTING DEVICE USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 22.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Amendment by applicant 
18.10.2019Change - designated statespublished on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
StradVision, Inc.
4427, Complex 4
67 Cheongam-ro
Nam-gu
Pohang-si
Gyeongsangbuk-do 37673 / KR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Yongjoong
No. 4-4427, 67, Cheongam-ro
Nam-gu, Pohang-si
Gyeongsangbuk-do, 37673 / KR
02 / Nam, Woonhyun
203-803, 57, Yugang-gil 9beon-gil
Yeonil-eup, Nam-gu, Pohang-si
Gyeongsangbuk-do, 37656 / KR
03 / Boo, Sukhoon
B02, 20-9, Manan-ro 55beon-gil
Manan-gu, Anyang-si
Gyeonggi-do, 14034 / KR
04 / Sung, Myungchul
201, 13, Jangnyang-ro 174beon-gil
Buk-gu, Pohang-si
Gyeongsangbuk-do, 37593 / KR
05 / Yeo, Donghun
4-4427, 67, Cheongam-ro
Nam-gu, Pohang-si
Gyeongsangbuk-do, 37673 / KR
06 / Ryu, Wooju
4-4427, 67, Cheongam-ro
Nam-gu, Pohang-si
Gyeongsangbuk-do, 37673 / KR
07 / Jang, Taewoong
18-5, Eonju-ro 113-gil
Gangnam-gu
Seoul, 06108 / KR
08 / Jeong, Kyungjoong
232-501, Hyundaigreen Apt, 294
Jigok-ro, Nam-gu, Pohang-si
Gyeongsangbuk-do, 37671 / KR
09 / Je, Hongmo
5-1805, Seungni Apt, 20, Jigok-ro
Nam-gu, Pohang-si
Gyeongsangbuk-do, 37665 / KR
10 / Cho, Hojin
4-4427, 67, Cheongam-ro
Nam-gu, Pohang-si
Gyeongsangbuk-do, 37673 / KR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18192813.605.09.2018
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS20171578427216.10.2017         Original published format: US201715784272
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471022
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/62, G06K9/46, G06K9/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/47]
Former [2019/16]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:LERNVERFAHREN UND LERNVORRICHTUNG ZUM ANPASSEN DER PARAMETER VON CNN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON MEHRSKALIGEN MERKMALSKARTEN UND TESTVERFAHREN UND TESTVORRICHTUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG DESSELBEN[2019/16]
English:LEARNING METHOD AND LEARNING DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING PARAMETERS OF CNN BY USING MULTI-SCALE FEATURE MAPS AND TESTING METHOD AND TESTING DEVICE USING THE SAME[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'APPRENTISSAGE ET DISPOSITIF D'APPRENTISSAGE POUR AJUSTER LES PARAMÈTRES DE CNN EN UTILISANT DES CARTES DE PARTICULARITÉS MULTI-ÉCHELLE, PROCÉDÉ DE TEST ET DISPOSITIF DE TEST L'UTILISANT[2019/16]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
05.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
16.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - SEAN BELL ET AL, "Inside-Outside Net: Detecting Objects in Context with Skip Pooling and Recurrent Neural Networks", 2016 IEEE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION (CVPR), (20160601), doi:10.1109/CVPR.2016.314, ISBN 978-1-4673-8851-1, pages 2874 - 2883, XP055564497 [X] 1-16 * sect.1 and 3;; figures 1-3 * [I] 5,6,13,14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2016.314
 [XI]  - Sergey Zagoruyko ET AL, "A MultiPath Network for Object Detection", (20160407), URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1604.02135.pdf, XP055564530 [X] 1-16 * sect.1, 3, 3.2;; figure 1 * [I] 5,6,13,14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.5244/C.30.15
 [XI]  - Guangxing Han ET AL, "Revisiting Faster R-CNN: A Deeper Look at Region Proposal Network", Serious Games, Cham, Springer International Publishing, (20170101), vol. 10636, pages 14 - 24, 032682, doi:10.1007/978-3-319-70090-8_2, ISSN 0302-9743, ISBN 978-3-642-37803-4, XP055564559 [X] 1-16 * sect.1-3 * [I] 5,6,13,14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-319-70090-8_2