Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474383

EP3474383 - DIN RAIL INSTALLING PORTION STRUCTURE OF ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE AND SOCKET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 24.04.2019  [2019/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OMRON CORPORATION
801, Minamifudodo-cho
Horikawahigashiiru
Shiokoji-dori
Shimogyo-Ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / AZUMA, Yoshihiro
c/o OMRON Corporation, 801, Minamifudodo-cho
Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
02 / MATSUNAGA, Kiyokazu
c/o OMRON RELAY & DEVICES Corporation, 1110, Sugi
Yamaga-shi, Kumamoto 861-0596 / JP
03 / HASHIMOTO, Hiroshi
c/o OMRON Corporation, 801, Minamifudodo-cho
Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
04 / YANO, Keisuke
c/o OMRON Corporation, 801, Minamifudodo-cho
Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date18193459.710.09.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateJP2017020471823.10.2017         Original published format: JP 2017204718
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474383
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01R9/26
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DIN-SCHIENEN-INSTALLATIONSABSCHNITTSTRUKTUR VON ELEKTRISCHEM GERÄT UND STECKDOSE[2019/17]
English:DIN RAIL INSTALLING PORTION STRUCTURE OF ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE AND SOCKET[2019/17]
French:STRUCTURE DE PARTIE D'INSTALLATION DE RAIL DIN D'APPAREIL ÉLECTRIQUE ET DOUILLE[2019/17]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Documents cited:Search[XDI]JP2006068852  (IDEC CORP) [XD] 1-5,7,8 * figures 4-7; claim 1 * [I] 6;
 [X]JPH06223927  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1-3,7,8 * paragraph [0022]; figures 1-6 *;
 [X]CH581395  (WOERTZ FA) [X] 1-3,5,8 * abstract *;
 [X]DE202008017151U  (SWITCHLAB INC [TW]) [X] 1-3,5,8 * figures 1-6; claim 1 *;
 [X]DE2752259  (DELTA CLIP VERBINDUNGSTECHNIK) [X] 1,3,5,8 * page 6, paragraph 4 - page 7, paragraph 1; figures 2-3 *;
 [X]JPS6286800  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,3,8 * figures 1-7; claim 1 *
by applicantJP2006068852