Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470070

EP3470070 - METHODS AND MATERIALS FOR TREATING CALCIFIC AORTIC VALVE STENOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 17.04.2019  [2019/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research
200 First Street S.W.
Rochester, MN 55905 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / MILLER, Jordan, D.
615 8th Avenue S.W.
Rochester, MN Minnesota 55902 / US
02 / ZHANG, Bin
1637 9th Ave N.E.
Apt. 305
Rochester, MN Minnesota 55906 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Kunz, Herbert
Fish & Richardson P.C.
Highlight Business Towers
Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8
80807 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18193737.620.12.2013
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateUS201261740680P21.12.2012         Original published format: US 201261740680 P
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470070
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/4985, A61K31/197, A61K31/416, A61K31/506, A61K31/5375, A61P9/00, A61P9/10
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND MATERIALIEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KALKAORTENKLAPPENSTENOSE[2019/16]
English:METHODS AND MATERIALS FOR TREATING CALCIFIC AORTIC VALVE STENOSIS[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET MATÉRIAUX POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA STÉNOSE VALVULAIRE AORTIQUE CALCIFIÉE[2019/16]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
11.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13864299.6  / EP2938343
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational searchUS6916927  [ ]
 US6911542  [ ]
 US6903099  [ ] (ORME MARK W [US], et al)
 US6878711  [ ]
 US6872721  [ ]
 US6858620  [ ]
 US6825197  [ ]
 US6774128  [ ]
 US6723719  [ ]
 US6699870  [ ]
 US6670366  [ ]
 US5859006  [ ]
 US5250534  [ ]
 WO03063875  [ ]
 WO03015761  [ ]
 WO2004037183  [ ]
 WO9838168  [ ]
 US7014866  [ ]
 US2006094744  [ ]
 US2006079502  [ ]
 [A]EP2264017  (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *
    [ ] - WALKER et al., Xenobiotica, (20010000), vol. 31, pages 651 - 664
    [ ] - GARDINER et al., J. Pharmacol. Exp. Ther., (20050000), vol. 312, pages 265 - 271
    [ ] - ABEL et al., Xenobiotica, (20010000), vol. 31, pages 665 - 76
    [ ] - DEGUCHI et al., Molecular Cancer Therapeutics, (20020000), pages 803 - 809
    [ ] - SENZAKI et al., FASEB J., (20010000), vol. 15, pages 1718 - 1726
    [ ] - SCUTT et al., BMC Pharmacol., (20040000), vol. 4, page 10
    [ ] - SCUTT et al., BMC Pharmacol, (20040000), vol. 4, page 10
    [ ] - DUKARM et al., Am. J. Respir. Crit. Care Med., (19990000), vol. 160, pages 858 - 865
 [A]  - R. V. FREEMAN, "Spectrum of Calcific Aortic Valve Disease: Pathogenesis, Disease Progression, and Treatment Strategies", CIRCULATION, US, (20050621), vol. 111, no. 24, doi:10.1161/CIRCULATIONAHA.104.486738, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 3316 - 3326, XP055298304 [A] 1-4 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/CIRCULATIONAHA.104.486738
 [A]  - MOHLER E R ED - CHILTON ROBERT, "Mechanisms of aortic valve calcification", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CARDIOLOGY, CAHNERS PUBLISHING CO., NEWTON, MA, US, (20041201), vol. 94, no. 11, doi:10.1016/J.AMJCARD.2004.08.013, ISSN 0002-9149, pages 1396 - 1402, XP004651347 [A] 1-4 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.amjcard.2004.08.013
 [A]  - T. NAGAYAMA ET AL, "Sustained Soluble Guanylate Cyclase Stimulation Offsets Nitric-Oxide Synthase Inhibition to Restore Acute Cardiac Modulation by Sildenafil", JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, US, (20080801), vol. 326, no. 2, doi:10.1124/jpet.108.137422, ISSN 0022-3565, pages 380 - 387, XP055271695 [A] 1-4 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/jpet.108.137422