Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3470420

EP3470420 - METHODS OF MODULATING SEED AND ORGAN SIZE IN PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institute Of Genetics And Developmental Biology
Chinese Academy of Sciences
Beijing 100101 / CN
For all designated states
Plant Bioscience Limited
Norwich Research Park Colney Lane
Norwich, Norfolk NR4 7UH / GB
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Yunhai
Chinese Academy of Sciences
Beijing, 100101 / CN
02 / XIA, Tian
Chinese Academy of Sciences
Beijing, 100101 / CN
03 / LI, Na
Chinese Academy of Sciences
Beijing, 100101 / CN
04 / DUMENIL, Jack
106 Woolbrook Road
Sidmouth Devon EX10 9EA / GB
05 / BEVAN, Michael
Department of Cell and Developmental Biology
John Innes Centre
Norwich, Norfolk NR4 7UH / GB
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date18193786.330.07.2014
[2019/16]
Priority number, dateWO2013CN8145714.08.2013         Original published format: PCT/CN2013/081457
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3470420
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/415, A61K38/53, C12N15/82, C12N9/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR MODULATION DER SAMEN- UND ORGANGRÖSSE BEI PFLANZEN[2019/16]
English:METHODS OF MODULATING SEED AND ORGAN SIZE IN PLANTS[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE MODULATION DE LA TAILLE DES GRAINES ET DES ORGANES DANS DES PLANTES[2019/16]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14749749.9  / EP3033354
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2009047525  (PLANT BIOSCIENCE LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-11,15 * claims 41-46 * * page 5, lines 14-15 * * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 3 * [Y] 12-14;
 [Y]WO2010042575  (MONSANTO TECHNOLOGY LLC [US], et al) [Y] 12-14 * claims 4,5; tables 1,6; sequences 37,49,26,51,55 * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0052] *;
 [XY]  - KRIZEK ET AL, "Making bigger plants: key regulators of final organ size", CURRENT OPINION IN PLANT BIOLOGY, QUADRANT SUBSCRIPTION SERVICES, GB, vol. 12, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.PBI.2008.09.006, ISSN 1369-5266, (20090201), pages 17 - 22, (20081023), XP025770802 [X] 1-11,15 * page 21, column 1, lines 23-27 * [Y] 12-14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pbi.2008.09.006
 [XP]  - L. DU ET AL, "The Ubiquitin Receptor DA1 Regulates Seed and Organ Size by Modulating the Stability of the Ubiquitin-Specific Protease UBP15/SOD2 in Arabidopsis", THE PLANT CELL ONLINE, (20140201), vol. 26, no. 2, doi:10.1105/tpc.114.122663, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 665 - 677, XP055146585 [XP] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.114.122663
 [XP]  - T. XIA ET AL, "The Ubiquitin Receptor DA1 Interacts with the E3 Ubiquitin Ligase DA2 to Regulate Seed and Organ Size in Arabidopsis", THE PLANT CELL ONLINE, (20130901), vol. 25, no. 9, doi:10.1105/tpc.113.115063, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 3347 - 3359, XP055146588 [XP] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.113.115063
 [A]  - LI YUNHAI ET AL, "Control of final seed and organ size by the DA1 gene family in Arabidopsis thaliana", GENES AND DEVELOPMENT, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, PLAINVIEW, NY, US, (20080501), vol. 22, no. 10, doi:10.1101/GAD.463608, ISSN 0890-9369, pages 1331 - 1336, XP002512707 [A] 1-15 * page 1334, column 1, lines 17-24 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/GAD.463608
 [A]  - DISCH S ET AL, "The E3 Ubiquitin Ligase BIG BROTHER Controls Arabidopsis Organ Size in a Dosage-Dependent Manner", CURRENT BIOLOGY, CURRENT SCIENCE, GB, vol. 16, no. 3, ISSN 0960-9822, (20060207), pages 272 - 279, (20060207), XP027967450 [A] 1-15 * abstract *
 [A]  - D. GUERRA ET AL, "Identification of a Protein Network Interacting with TdRF1, a Wheat RING Ubiquitin Ligase with a Protective Role against Cellular Dehydration", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (20120201), vol. 158, no. 2, doi:10.1104/pp.111.183988, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 777 - 789, XP055076400 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.111.183988
by applicantWO2009047525
 US5231020
 WO9534668
 EP1407000
 WO9214828
 US5100792
 EP0444882
 EP0434616
 EP0290395
 WO8706614
 WO9209696
 WO9400583
 EP0331083
 EP0175966
 DE4005152
 WO9012096
 US4684611
 EP0486234
 EP0486233
    - ALONSO-BLANCO, C., PNAS USA, (19990000), vol. 96, pages 4710 - 7
    - SONG, X.J., Nat Genet, (20070000), vol. 39, pages 623 - 30
    - WEISS, J. Int J Dev Biol, (20050000), vol. 49, pages 513 - 25
    - DINNENY, J.R., Development, (20040000), vol. 131, pages 1101 - 10
    - DISCH, S., Curr Biol, (20060000), vol. 16, pages 272 - 9
    - Science, (20000000), vol. 289, pages 85 - 8
    - HORIGUCHI, G., Plant J, (20050000), vol. 43, pages 68 - 78
    - HU, Y, Plant J, (20060000), vol. 47, pages 1 - 9
    - HU, Y., Plant Cell, (20030000), vol. 15, pages 1951 - 61
    - KRIZEK, B.A., Dev Genet, (19990000), vol. 25, pages 224 - 36
    - MIZUKAMI, Y., PNAS USA, (20000000), vol. 97, pages 942 - 7
    - NATH, U., Science, (20030000), vol. 299, pages 1404 - 7
    - OHNO, C.K., Development, (20040000), vol. 131, pages 1111 - 22
    - SZECSI, J., Embo J, (20060000), vol. 25, pages 3912 - 20
    - WHITE, D.W., PNAS USA, (20060000), vol. 103, pages 13238 - 43
    - HORVATH, B.M., Embo J, (20060000), vol. 25, pages 4909 - 20
    - GARCIA, D., Plant Cell, (20050000), vol. 17, pages 52 - 60
    - FAN, C., Theor. Appl. Genet., (20060000), vol. 112, pages 1164 - 1171
    - SCHRUFF, M.C., Development, (20060000), vol. 137, pages 251 - 261
    - OHTO, M.A., PNAS USA, (20050000), vol. 102, pages 3123 - 3128
    - JOFUKU, K.D., PNAS USA, (20050000), vol. 102, pages 3117 - 3122
    - MIZUKAMI, Y., Proc Natl Acad Sci U S A, (20000000), vol. 97, pages 942 - 7
    - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 405 - 410
    - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PNAS USA, (19880000), vol. 85, pages 2444 - 2448
    - SMITH; WATERMAN, J. Mol Biol., (19810000), vol. 147, pages 195 - 197
    - Nucl. Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402
    - Methods in Molecular Biology
    - URNOV, F.D. et al., "Nature reviews", Genetics, (20100000), vol. 11, pages 636 - 646
    - JOUNG, J.K. et al., "Nature reviews", Molecular cell biology, (20130000), vol. 14, pages 49 - 55
    - GASIUNAS, G. et al., PNAS USA, (20120000), vol. 109, pages E2579 - 2586
    - CONG, L. et al., Science, (20130000), vol. 339, pages 819 - 823
    - VAN DER KROL et al., The Plant Cell, (19900000), vol. 2, pages 291 - 299
    - NAPOLI et al., The Plant Cell, (19900000), vol. 2, pages 279 - 289
    - ZHANG et al., The Plant Cell, (19920000), vol. 4, pages 1575 - 1588
    - ANGELL; BAULCOMBE, The EMBO Journal, (19970000), vol. 16, no. 12, pages 3675 - 3684
    - VOINNET; BAULCOMBE, Nature, (19970000), vol. 389, page 553
    - FIRE A. et al., Nature, (19980000), vol. 391
    - ZAMORE P.D., Nature Structural Biology, (20010000), vol. 8, no. 9, pages 746 - 750
    - JOHN et al., PLoS Biology, (20040000), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 1862 - 1879
    - MYERS, Nature Biotechnology, (20030000), vol. 21, pages 324 - 328
    - SHINAGAWA et al., Genes and Dev., (20030000), vol. 17, pages 1340 - 5
    - SMITH et al., Nature, (19880000), vol. 334, pages 724 - 726
    - ENGLISH et al., The Plant Cell, (19960000), vol. 8, pages 179 - 188
    - BOURQUE, Plant Science, (19950000), vol. 105, pages 125 - 149
    - FLAVELL, PNAS USA, (19940000), vol. 91, pages 3490 - 3496
    - BEVAN, Nucl. Acids Res., (19840000), vol. 12, pages 8711 - 8721
    - "Plant transformation and expression vectors", GUERINEAU; MULLINEAUX, Plant Molecular Biology Labfax, BIOS Scientific Publishers, (19930000), pages 121 - 148
    - TORIYAMA et al., Bio/Technology, (19880000), vol. 6, pages 1072 - 1074
    - ZHANG et al., Plant Cell Rep., (19880000), vol. 7, pages 379 - 384
    - ZHANG et al., Theor Appl Genet, (19880000), vol. 76, pages 835 - 840
    - SHIMAMOTO et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 338, pages 274 - 276
    - DATTA et al., Bio/Technology, (19900000), vol. 8, pages 736 - 740
    - CHRISTOU et al., Bio/Technology, (19910000), vol. 9, pages 957 - 962
    - PENG et al., International Rice Research Institute, (19910000), pages 563 - 574
    - CAO et al., Plant Cell Rep., (19920000), vol. 11, pages 585 - 591
    - LI et al., Plant Cell Rep., (19930000), vol. 12, pages 250 - 255
    - RATHORE et al., Plant Molecular Biology, (19930000), vol. 21, pages 871 - 884
    - FROMM et al., Bio/Technology, (19900000), vol. 8, pages 833 - 839
    - GORDON-KAMM et al., Plant Cell, (19900000), vol. 2, pages 603 - 618
    - D'HALLUIN et al., Plant Cell, (19920000), vol. 4, pages 1495 - 1505
    - WALTERS et al., Plant Molecular Biology, (19920000), vol. 18, pages 189 - 200
    - KOZIEL et al., Biotechnology, (19930000), vol. 11, pages 194 - 200
    - VASIL, I. K., Plant Molecular Biology, (19940000), vol. 25, pages 925 - 937
    - WEEKS et al., Plant Physiology, (19930000), vol. 102, pages 1077 - 1084
    - SOMERS et al., Bio/Technology, (19920000), vol. 10, pages 1589 - 1594
    - NILSSON, 0. et al., Transgenic Research, (19920000), vol. 1, pages 209 - 220
    - FREEMAN et al., Plant Cell Physiol., (19840000), vol. 29, page 1353
    - KINDLE, PNAS U.S.A., (19900000), vol. 87, page 1228
    - OARD, Biotech. Adv., (19910000), vol. 9, pages 1 - 11
    - "Cell Culture and Somatic Cell Genetics of Plants", VASIL et al., Laboratory Procedures and Their Applications, Academic Press, (19840000), vol. I, II an
    - NOLLAU et al., Clin. Chem., (19970000), vol. 43, pages 1114 - 1120
    - ADAMSKI, N.M. et al., PNAS USA, (20090000), vol. 106, pages 20115 - 20120
    - ALEXANDRU, G. et al., Cell, (20080000), vol. 134, pages 804 - 816
    - ALONSO-BLANCO, C. et al., PNAS USA, (19990000), vol. 96, pages 4710 - 4717
    - BANDAU, S. et al., BMC Biol, (20120000), vol. 10, page 36
    - BEDNAREK, J., J. Exp. Bot., (20120000), vol. 63, no. 16, pages 5945 - 5955
    - CURTIS, M.D. et al., Plant physiology, (20030000), vol. 133, pages 462 - 469
    - DISCH, S. et al., Curr Biol, (20060000), vol. 16, pages 272 - 279
    - FAN, C. et al., Theor Appl Genet, (20060000), vol. 112, pages 1164 - 1171
    - FANG, W. et al., Plant J, (20120000), vol. 70, pages 929 - 939
    - GARCIA, D. et al., Plant Cell, (20050000), vol. 17, pages 52 - 60
    - GARCIA, D. et al., Plant Physiology, (20030000), vol. 131, pages 1661 - 1670
    - GEGAS, V.C. et al., Plant Cell, (20100000), vol. 22, pages 1046 - 1056
    - GOMEZ, J.M., Int J Org Evol, vol. 58, pages 71 - 80
    - HOELLER, D. et al., Mol Cell, (20070000), vol. 26, pages 891 - 898
    - HU, Y. et al., Plant Cell, (20030000), vol. 15, pages 1951 - 1961
    - JOFUKU, K.D. et al., PNAS USA, (20050000), vol. 102, pages 3117 - 3122
    - KAUR, N. et al., J Int Plant Biol, (20130000), vol. 55, pages 108 - 120
    - KRIZEK, B.A., Dev Genet, (19990000), vol. 25, pages 224 - 236
    - LANCTOT, A.A. et al., Developmental cell, (20130000), vol. 25, pages 241 - 255
    - LI, Y. et al., Genes Dev, (20080000), vol. 22, pages 1331 - 1336
    - LI, Y. et al., Genome Res, (20060000), vol. 16, pages 414 - 427
    - LOPES, M.A. et al., Plant Cell, (19930000), vol. 5, pages 1383 - 1399
    - LUO, M. et al., PNAS USA, (20050000), vol. 102, pages 17531 - 17536
    - MIZUKAMI, Y et al., PNAS USA, (20000000), vol. 97, pages 942 - 947
    - MOLES, A.T. et al., Science, (20050000), vol. 307, pages 576 - 580
    - OHTO, M.A. et al., PNAS USA, (20050000), vol. 102, pages 3123 - 3128
    - OHTO, M.A. et al., Sex Plant Reprod, (20090000), vol. 22, pages 277 - 289
    - ORSI, C.H. et al., PLoS Genet, (20090000), vol. 5, page el000347
    - PEREZ-PEREZ, J.M. et al., Trends Genet, (20090000), vol. 25, pages 368 - 376
    - PLATTA, H.W. et al., Mol Cell Biol, (20090000), vol. 29, pages 5505 - 5516
    - SCHNELL, J.D. et al., J Biol Chem, (20030000), vol. 278, pages 35857 - 35860
    - SCHRUFF, M.C. et al., Development, (20060000), vol. 133, pages 251 - 261
    - SEO, H.S. et al., Nature, (20030000), vol. 423, pages 995 - 999
    - SHOMURA, A. et al., Nat Genet, (20080000), vol. 40, pages 1023 - 1028
    - SMALLE, J. et al., Annual review of plant biology, (20040000), vol. 55, pages 555 - 590
    - SONG, X.J. et al., Nat Genet, (20070000), vol. 39, pages 623 - 630
    - STONE, S.L. et al., Plant physiology, (20050000), vol. 137, pages 13 - 30
    - VAN DAELE, I. et al., Plant Biotech J, (20120000), vol. 10, pages 488 - 500
    - VERMA, R. et al., Cell, (20040000), vol. 118, pages 99 - 110
    - VOINNET, 0. et al., Plant J, (20030000), vol. 33, pages 949 - 956
    - WANG et al., Afrian Journal of Biotechnology, (20120000), vol. 11, pages 13387 - 13395
    - WENG, J. et al., Cell Res, (20080000), vol. 18, pages 1199 - 1209
    - WESTOBY, M. et al., Ann. Rev. Ecol. System., (20020000), vol. 33, pages 125 - 159
    - WHITE, D.W., PNAS USA, (20060000), vol. 103, pages 13238 - 13243
    - WOELK, T. et al., Nat Cell Biol, (20060000), vol. 8, pages 1246 - 1254
    - XIE, Q. et al., Nature, (20020000), vol. 419, pages 167 - 170
    - XU, R. et al., Development, (20110000), vol. 138, pages 4545 - 4554
    - ZHOU, Y. et al., Plant Cell, (20090000), vol. 21, pages 106 - 117