Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474648

EP3474648 - COOLING MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.10.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Change - designated statespublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
25.10.2019Change - request for examinationpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, TX 77070 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / NORTON, John
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, TX Texas 77070 / US
02 / ARMES, James Lee
3404 E Harmony Road
FL Collins, CO Colorado 80528-3544 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Iqbal, Md Mash-Hud
Marks & Clerk LLP
62-68 Hills Road
Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date18193822.611.09.2018
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS20171578848619.10.2017         Original published format: US201715788486
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474648
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:H05K7/20
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/47]
Former [2019/17]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KÜHLMODUL[2019/17]
English:COOLING MODULE[2019/17]
French:MODULE DE REFROIDISSEMENT[2019/17]
Examination procedure16.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/47]
16.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2013333865  (GOTH GARY F [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038]; figures 2,6A,6B * [I] 2-15;
 [I]US2006161311  (VINSON WADE D [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0025]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0037]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0049]; figure 5 *;
 [XA]US2011308783  (NICEWONGER MARK RANDAL [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0011]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0017] * [A] 2-15;
 [A]US2013264030  (ECKBERG ERIC A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038]; figure 2A *