Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3474648 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3474648



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 168
17.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.10.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
17.10.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
17.10.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 17
17.10.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 17
17.10.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
17.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
16.10.2019 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 5
16.10.2019 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
26.09.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
20.09.2019 General authorisation Search / examination 3
20.09.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
12.08.2019 General authorisation Search / examination 1
12.08.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 13
29.04.2019 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
25.04.2019 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
27.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
26.03.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.03.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 6
26.03.2019 European search report Search / examination 2
26.03.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
11.03.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
19.02.2019 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
11.02.2019 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
08.10.2018 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
08.10.2018 Priority document Search / examination 37
11.09.2018 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.09.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
11.09.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
11.09.2018 Description Search / examination 15
11.09.2018 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.09.2018 Drawings Search / examination 3
11.09.2018 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4