Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3474648 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201811106156 EP18193822



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US10349560Global Dossier 09.07.2019B2
US2019124797 25.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201715788486 19.10.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN109688761Global Dossier 26.04.2019A
Priority number Date
US201715788486 19.10.2017
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3474648Global Dossier 24.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201715788486 19.10.2017