Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473175

EP3473175 - ECG ELECTRODE CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 24.04.2019  [2019/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KPR U.S., LLC
777 West Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Selvitelli, David
185 North Main Street
Suffield, CT 06078 / US
02 / Meyer, Peter
4 Ivy Path
Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Prock, Thomas
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date18193825.910.12.2008
[2019/17]
Priority number, dateUS20070012825P11.12.2007         Original published format: US 12825 P
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473175
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/0416, A61B5/0428, H01R13/52, H01R13/627, H01R101/00, H01R4/52
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:EKG-ELEKTRODEN-VERBINDER[2019/17]
English:ECG ELECTRODE CONNECTOR[2019/17]
French:CONNECTEUR D'ÉLECTRODE ECG[2019/17]
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
11.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08171185.5  / EP2070474
EP14197698.5  / EP2856938
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[A]US5944562  (CHRISTENSSON EDDY K G [US]) [A] 1,2,4-11 * column 5, paragraph 3 - column 6, paragraph 4; figures 1-4,12,14,20 * * column 7, paragraph 3 *;
 [X]US3829826  (BROWN D ET AL) [X] 1-11 * column 2, paragraphs 28-54; figures 3,4 *;
 [X]US7255609  (EPSTEIN STEPHEN T [US]) [X] 1-11 * column 5, paragraphs 1-3; figures 2-4 *;
 [X]US2006068649  (SILBER DANIEL A [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 3, paragraph 1 *;
 [A]US2004203273  (SCHWARZ DIETER [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [X]US6487430  (HENDERSON ROBERT E [US] ET AL) [X] 1-11 * column 3, paragraphs 3-4; figure 3 *